Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1039 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7429 Week
» 36927 Month
» 373773 Year
» 1595338 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1100 m/e 06/1906
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6100   08/11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1495   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1485   22/09/1946
British Railways 61485   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B4/206/1906
B4/107/05/1932
B4/302/07/1938
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9458
Works Number 4821
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Sat 04/06/1949 off Ardsley (ARD)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 43 yrs , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 06/1906
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 08/12/1922
MAR March on 04/06/1923
MEX Mexborough m/e 10/1923
DON Doncaster on 02/06/1924
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) on 19/11/1924
ARD Ardsley on 25/01/1940
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) on 19/10/1941
ARD Ardsley on 06/09/1942
   Withdrawn on 04/06/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN ARD Ardsley on 04/06/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1906 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1210)
25/12/1909 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 833)
30/05/1914 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 836)
09/09/1916 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1205)
31/07/1920 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 539)
08/11/1924 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1149)
01/03/1930 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 681)
23/06/1934 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 802)
31/10/1936 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 127)
02/07/1938 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 132)
17/08/1940 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 801)
27/03/1943 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 802)
10/11/1945 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 923)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/11/1909 25/12/1909 54 days General
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1914 30/05/1914 36 days General
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 29/07/1916 09/09/1916 43 days General
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1920 31/07/1920 36 days General
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1922 23/09/1922 64 days General  
Gorton Works 23/08/1924 08/11/1924 78 days General
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6100
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1925 09/01/1926 225 days General
Superheater fitted
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1928 04/08/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 18/01/1930 01/03/1930 43 days General
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1932 07/05/1932 43 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/1
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1934 23/06/1934 22 days General
Heater connection fitted at front end
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/10/1936 31/10/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/06/1938 02/07/1938 15 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/3
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1940 17/08/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/03/1943 27/03/1943 23 days General
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1945 10/11/1945 29 days Heavy
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Belle Vue MPD 2700, 2971, 5180/7,5429/30, 5503, 6100, 6031 an 6575 were noted on trials ex Gorton during November. 4665 was noted on a local passenger ex Manchester (London Road). other strangers included 1992 ex G.W. SLS/194601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1100
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4821
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
02/11/1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1909. Dep: 25/12/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
25/04/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1914. Dep: 30/05/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
29/07/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1916. Dep: 09/09/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
26/06/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1920. Dep: 31/07/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
22/07/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1922. Dep: 23/09/1922.    
08/12/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
04/06/1923 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
10/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6100
   
19/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
30/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1925. Dep: 09/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Superheater fitted
   
23/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 04/08/1928.    
18/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
26/03/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1932. Dep: 07/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/1
   
02/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Heater connection fitted at front end
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
10/10/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
18/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/3
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
25/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
03/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
19/10/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
06/09/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
05/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
13/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/10/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1495 but not taken up    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1485    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61485 but not taken up    
04/06/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1485 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev