|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 02/11/1909 | 25/12/1909 | 54 days | General | Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1914 | 30/05/1914 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/07/1916 | 09/09/1916 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/06/1920 | 31/07/1920 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 539 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1922 | 23/09/1922 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/08/1924 | 08/11/1924 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 16Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6100 |
||
Gorton Works | 30/05/1925 | 09/01/1926 | 225 days | General | Superheater fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1928 | 04/08/1928 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/01/1930 | 01/03/1930 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/03/1932 | 07/05/1932 | 43 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/1 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/06/1934 | 23/06/1934 | 22 days | General | Heater connection fitted at front end Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/10/1936 | 31/10/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1938 | 02/07/1938 | 15 days | General | Rebuilt to class B4/3 Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/08/1940 | 17/08/1940 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/03/1943 | 27/03/1943 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/10/1945 | 10/11/1945 | 29 days | Heavy | Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1945 | Belle Vue MPD | 2700, 2971, 5180/7,5429/30, 5503, 6100, 6031 an 6575 were noted on trials ex Gorton during November. 4665 was noted on a local passenger ex Manchester (London Road). other strangers included 1992 ex G.W. | SLS/194601 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1906 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 1100 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4821 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1909. Dep: 25/12/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
25/04/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1914. Dep: 30/05/1914. Work undertaken: Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
29/07/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/07/1916. Dep: 09/09/1916. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1205 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
26/06/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1920. Dep: 31/07/1920. Work undertaken: Boiler number 539 (Diagram 16Sat) |
||
22/07/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1922. Dep: 23/09/1922. | ||
08/12/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
04/06/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
10/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
02/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/08/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1924. Dep: 08/11/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1149 (Diagram 16Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6100 |
||
19/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
30/05/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1925. Dep: 09/01/1926. Work undertaken: Superheater fitted |
||
23/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 04/08/1928. | ||
18/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1930. Dep: 01/03/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
26/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1932. Dep: 07/05/1932. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/1 |
||
02/06/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934. Work undertaken: Heater connection fitted at front end Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
10/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/10/1936. Dep: 31/10/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
18/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938. Work undertaken: Rebuilt to class B4/3 Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
25/01/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
03/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1940. Dep: 17/08/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
19/10/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
06/09/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
05/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/03/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 802 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
13/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 13/10/1945. Dep: 10/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1495 but not taken up | ||
22/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1485 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61485 but not taken up | ||
04/06/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1485 from Ardsley (ARD) |