Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 140 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3283 Week
» 13453 Month
» 291249 Year
» 1175630 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1101 m/e 06/1906
LNER (1924) 6101   25/04/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1496   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1486   01/12/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B4/206/1906
B4/125/06/1927
B4/328/03/1936
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9458
Works Number 4822
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Tue 07/10/1947 off Ardsley (ARD)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 41 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up ll/10/47 but cut up at Dukinfield instead

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 19/05/1922
MAR March m/e 06/1923
MEX Mexborough m/e 10/1923
DON Doncaster 22/03/1924
GOR Gorton 23/04/1925
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 29/05/1925
IMM Immingham 18/03/1933
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 24/08/1933
ARD Ardsley 25/01/1940
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 11/07/1941
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 10/12/1942
ARD Ardsley 28/03/1943
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 30/06/1943
ARD Ardsley 07/07/1943
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 02/12/1945
ARD Ardsley 19/05/1946
   Withdrawn 07/10/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BFD Bradford Hammerton Street m/e 31/01/1946
WDN ARD Ardsley 07/10/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1906 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1211)
17/06/1911 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1212)
16/08/1919 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1141)
25/04/1925 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 1470)
25/06/1927 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 122)
08/09/1931 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 784)
16/12/1933 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 127)
28/03/1936 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 121)
15/10/1938 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 127)
11/04/1942 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 55)
30/12/1944 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 132)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 10/02/1911 17/06/1911 128 days General
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1919 16/08/1919 42 days General
Boiler number 1141 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 30/04/1921 18/06/1921 50 days General  
Gorton Works 16/12/1922 03/03/1923 78 days General  
Gorton Works 01/11/1925 25/04/1925 -189 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
 
Gorton Works 26/03/1927 25/06/1927 92 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/1
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/11/1928 19/01/1929 64 days General  
Gorton Works 11/07/1931 08/09/1931 60 days General
Boiler number 784 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/03/1933 18/03/1933 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 25/11/1933 16/12/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1936 28/03/1936 22 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/3
Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1938 15/10/1938 43 days General
Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1942 11/04/1942 18 days General
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/03/1943 27/03/1943 16 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/12/1944 30/12/1944 15 days General
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as GCR Number 1101
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4822
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
10/02/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1911. Dep: 17/06/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1212 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
06/07/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1919. Dep: 16/08/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1141 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
30/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/04/1921. Dep: 18/06/1921.    
19/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
16/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1922. Dep: 03/03/1923.    
06/1923 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
10/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
22/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/04/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
25/04/1925 Modification Diagram 16Sup number 1470 boiler fitted    
25/04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6101    
29/05/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
01/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1925. Dep: 25/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
   
26/03/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1927. Dep: 25/06/1927.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/1
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
17/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929.    
11/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 08/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 784 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
04/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/03/1933. Dep: 18/03/1933.    
18/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/08/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
25/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
07/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 28/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/3
Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
03/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1938. Dep: 15/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 127 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
25/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
11/07/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
25/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
10/12/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
12/03/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/03/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943.    
28/03/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
30/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
07/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
16/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1944. Dep: 30/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
02/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1496 but not taken up    
19/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1486    
07/10/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1486 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev