Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 749 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1789 Week
» 11959 Month
» 289755 Year
» 1174136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 102 m/e 06/1906
LNER (1924) 6102   07/02/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1497   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1487   12/01/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B4/206/1906
B4/408/02/1936
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9458
Works Number 4823
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1906
Withdrawal Wed 10/12/1947 off Ardsley (ARD)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 41 yrs, 6 mths , 9 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 13/12/47 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 19/05/1922
MAR March m/e 06/1923
SHF Sheffield Neepsend m/e 01/1925
NWE New England 27/04/1925
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 26/10/1925
GOR Gorton 25/01/1940
ARD Ardsley 28/02/1940
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 02/12/1945
ARD Ardsley 19/05/1946
   Withdrawn 10/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BFD Bradford Hammerton Street m/e 31/01/1946
WDN ARD Ardsley 10/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1906 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1212)
17/02/1911 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1209)
19/12/1914 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 833)
06/08/1921 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1182)
17/09/1927 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 798)
21/11/1931 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 55)
02/09/1933 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 121)
08/02/1936 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 128)
25/02/1939 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 121)
06/03/1943 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 684)
30/09/1944 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 681)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/12/1910 17/02/1911 71 days General
Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/09/1914 19/12/1914 99 days General
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1921 06/08/1921 29 days General
Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1923 03/03/1923 50 days General  
Gorton Works 29/11/1924 07/02/1925 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6102
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1927 17/09/1927 134 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1929 09/11/1929 43 days General  
Gorton Works 17/10/1931 21/11/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1932 24/09/1932 22 days General  
Gorton Works 12/08/1933 02/09/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1936 08/02/1936 22 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/4
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 26/12/1936 23/01/1937 29 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 25/12/1937 08/01/1938 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 04/02/1939 25/02/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1943 06/03/1943 25 days General
New right hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/09/1944 30/09/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1906 To Service To service as GCR Number 102
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4823
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
09/12/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1910. Dep: 17/02/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1209 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
12/09/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1914. Dep: 19/12/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
09/07/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1921. Dep: 06/08/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1182 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
19/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
13/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1923. Dep: 03/03/1923.    
06/1923 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
29/11/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/11/1924. Dep: 07/02/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6102
   
01/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
27/04/1925 Allocation Reallocated to New England (NWE)    
26/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
07/05/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 798 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
28/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1929. Dep: 09/11/1929.    
17/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
03/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932.    
12/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
18/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1936. Dep: 08/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/4
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
26/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/12/1936. Dep: 23/01/1937.    
25/12/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938.    
04/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 121 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
25/01/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/02/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
10/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1943. Dep: 06/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
New right hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
05/09/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1944. Dep: 30/09/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
02/12/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1497 but not taken up    
19/05/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
12/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1487    
10/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1487 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev