Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 141 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1181 Week
» 11351 Month
» 289147 Year
» 1173528 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1103 m/e 07/1906
LNER (1923 Int) 1103C   04/08/1923
LNER (1924) 6103   29/11/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1498   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1488   17/11/1946
BR 61488   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B4/207/1906
B4/121/05/1927
B4/311/03/1939
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9458
Works Number 4824
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1906
Withdrawal Thu 07/10/1948 off Ardsley (ARD)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 42 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 19/05/1922
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 27/05/1925
DON Doncaster 21/09/1932
MEX Mexborough 30/01/1933
IMM Immingham 16/03/1933
MAR March 03/06/1933
LIN Lincoln 08/07/1935
RET Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 26/06/1939
LIN Lincoln 15/03/1940
DON Doncaster 29/11/1942
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 25/06/1945
ARD Ardsley 16/02/1947
   Withdrawn 07/10/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley 16/02/1947
WDN ARD Ardsley 07/10/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1906 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1213)
08/07/1911 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1211)
26/09/1914 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1207)
22/11/1919 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1142)
13/03/1926 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 833)
21/05/1927 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 1470)
10/01/1931 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 797)
08/07/1933 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 128)
06/04/1935 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 684)
13/02/1937 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 797)
11/03/1939 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 128)
10/07/1943 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 122)
14/09/1946 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 3395)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 28/04/1911 08/07/1911 72 days General
Boiler number 1211 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1914 26/09/1914 64 days General
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1919 22/11/1919 309 days General
Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1921 04/06/1921 57 days General  
Gorton Works 17/02/1923 23/06/1923 127 days General  
Gorton Works 13/09/1924 29/11/1924 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6103
 
Gorton Works 02/01/1926 13/03/1926 71 days General
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 08/01/1927 21/05/1927 134 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/1
Boiler number 1470 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/12/1928 09/02/1929 64 days General  
Gorton Works 22/11/1930 10/01/1931 50 days General
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1932 30/04/1932 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 17/06/1933 08/07/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1933 11/11/1933 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 16/03/1935 06/04/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/01/1937 13/02/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1939 11/03/1939 22 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/3
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/06/1941 12/07/1941 31 days General  
Gorton Works 08/06/1943 10/07/1943 33 days General
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1946 14/09/1946 120 days General
Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 16Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1906 To Service To service as GCR Number 1103
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4824
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
28/04/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/04/1911. Dep: 08/07/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1211 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
25/07/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1914. Dep: 26/09/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1207 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
18/01/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1919. Dep: 22/11/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1142 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
09/04/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1921. Dep: 04/06/1921.    
19/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
17/02/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1923. Dep: 23/06/1923.    
04/08/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 1103C    
13/09/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/09/1924. Dep: 29/11/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6103
   
27/05/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
02/01/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1926. Dep: 13/03/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
08/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/01/1927. Dep: 21/05/1927.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/1
Boiler number 1470 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
08/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929.    
22/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 10/01/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
09/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932.    
21/09/1932 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
30/01/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/03/1933 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
03/06/1933 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
17/06/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/06/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
28/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933.    
16/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1935. Dep: 06/04/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
08/07/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
23/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1937. Dep: 13/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 797 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
18/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1939. Dep: 11/03/1939.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/3
Boiler number 128 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
26/06/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET)    
15/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
12/06/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941.    
29/11/1942 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
08/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1943. Dep: 10/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1498 but not taken up    
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3395 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1488    
16/02/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61488 but not taken up    
07/10/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1488 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev prev