Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 945 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 5076 Week
» 15246 Month
» 293042 Year
» 1177423 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1104 m/e 07/1906
LNER (1924) 6104   26/07/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1499   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1489   12/01/1947

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B4
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B4/207/1906
B4/112/03/1927
B4/312/02/1938
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9458
Works Number 4825
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1906
Withdrawal Fri 04/07/1947 off Lincoln (LIN)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 41 yrs , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 15/04/1922
MAR March m/e 06/1923
MEX Mexborough m/e 10/1923
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 12/08/1924
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 27/05/1925
MAR March 09/05/1933
LIN Lincoln 03/10/1935
IMM Immingham 06/07/1937
LIN Lincoln 03/09/1937
   Withdrawn 04/07/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN LIN Lincoln 04/07/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1906 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1214)
09/07/1910 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 834)
15/06/1912 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 836)
07/03/1914 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 1208)
26/07/1924 Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted (number 55)
10/11/1928 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 923)
26/11/1932 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 132)
04/08/1934 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 681)
09/05/1936 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 922)
12/02/1938 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 122)
13/04/1940 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 684)
06/02/1943 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 923)
20/01/1945 Diagram 16Sup boiler fitted (number 801)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 26/03/1910 09/07/1910 106 days General
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1912 15/06/1912 99 days General
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1914 07/03/1914 29 days General
Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 16Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1921 19/11/1921 106 days General  
Gorton Works 17/05/1924 26/07/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6104
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1925 20/02/1926 78 days General  
Gorton Works 02/10/1926 12/03/1927 162 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/1
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1928 10/11/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/12/1930 24/01/1931 36 days General  
Gorton Works 22/10/1932 26/11/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/07/1934 04/08/1934 22 days General
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1936 09/05/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1938 12/02/1938 29 days General
Rebuilt to class B4/3
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 16/03/1940 13/04/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1943 06/02/1943 23 days General
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/02/1944 05/02/1944 2 days Light Repair
Tender only repair
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1944 20/01/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1947 04/07/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1906 To Service To service as GCR Number 1104
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4825
Diagram 16Sat boiler fitted
   
26/03/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/03/1910. Dep: 09/07/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 834 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
09/03/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1912. Dep: 15/06/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 836 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
07/02/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1914. Dep: 07/03/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1208 (Diagram 16Sat)
   
06/08/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1921. Dep: 19/11/1921.    
15/04/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
06/1923 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
10/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
17/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 55 (Diagram 16Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6104
   
12/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
27/05/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
05/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926.    
02/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1926. Dep: 12/03/1927.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/1
   
22/09/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1928. Dep: 10/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
20/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1930. Dep: 24/01/1931.    
22/10/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1932. Dep: 26/11/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 132 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
09/05/1933 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
14/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 681 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
03/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
18/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1936. Dep: 09/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 922 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
06/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
03/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
15/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 12/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Rebuilt to class B4/3
Boiler number 122 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
16/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1940. Dep: 13/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 684 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
15/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1943. Dep: 06/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 923 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
04/02/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/02/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender only repair
   
23/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 801 (Diagram 16Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1499 but not taken up    
12/01/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 1489    
04/07/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1489 from Lincoln (LIN)    
04/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/07/1947. Dep: 04/07/1947.    

prev