Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 735 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4903 Week
» 20017 Month
» 323207 Year
» 1544772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1067 m/e 11/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6067   25/10/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1300   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1678   10/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B511/1902
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E884
Works Number 6235
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Thu 20/11/1947 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 45 yrs , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1902
MEX Mexborough on 19/05/1922
DON Doncaster on 02/06/1924
LIN Lincoln on 18/11/1926
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 15/11/1935
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
MEX Mexborough on 31/05/1943
   Withdrawn on 20/11/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN MEX Mexborough on 20/11/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1902 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 338)
11/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1288)
06/01/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 338)
22/11/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 827)
25/10/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1772)
15/09/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 905)
07/05/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 848)
16/12/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 893)
16/11/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 148)
18/12/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 725)
05/09/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3736)
20/01/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 837)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 11/1907   General  
Gorton Works 28/10/1911 06/01/1912 71 days General
Boiler number 338 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 01/03/1919 22/11/1919 267 days General
Boiler number 827 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1921 11/03/1922 141 days General  
Gorton Works 23/08/1924 25/10/1924 64 days General
Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6067
 
Gorton Works 31/07/1926 06/11/1926 99 days General  
Gorton Works 21/07/1928 15/09/1928 57 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1930 23/08/1930 64 days General
21 in type SK cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 09/04/1932 07/05/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1933 16/12/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1935 16/11/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/11/1937 18/12/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1940 24/08/1940 22 days General  
Gorton Works 17/08/1942 05/09/1942 20 days General
Boiler number 3736 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1944 20/01/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1946 31/08/1946 1 day Light Repair  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1067
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6235
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
11/1907 Modification Diagram 17Sat number 1288 boiler fitted    
11/1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Dep: 00/11/1907.    
28/10/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/10/1911. Dep: 06/01/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 338 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
01/03/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1919. Dep: 22/11/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 827 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
22/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1921. Dep: 11/03/1922.    
19/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
02/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
23/08/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1924. Dep: 25/10/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6067
   
31/07/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/07/1926. Dep: 06/11/1926.    
18/11/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
21/07/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1928. Dep: 15/09/1928.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 905 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 23/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
21 in type SK cylinders fitted
   
09/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1932. Dep: 07/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 16/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1935. Dep: 16/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/11/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
27/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1937. Dep: 18/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1940. Dep: 24/08/1940.    
17/08/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1942. Dep: 05/09/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3736 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
31/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1300 but not taken up    
31/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 31/08/1946. Dep: 31/08/1946.    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1678    
20/11/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1678 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev