Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1055 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2089 Week
» 24595 Month
» 327785 Year
» 1549350 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1068 m/e 11/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6068   09/01/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1301   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1679   07/07/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B511/1902
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E884
Works Number 6236
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Tue 23/12/1947 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 45 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 27/12/47 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1902
MEX Mexborough on 19/01/1917
ARD Ardsley on 05/01/1924
IMM Immingham on 22/05/1924
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) on 22/02/1926
IMM Immingham on 27/04/1926
DON Doncaster on 26/07/1927
WFD Woodford Halse on 14/07/1928
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 30/03/1936
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 06/10/1946
MEX Mexborough on 24/08/1947
   Withdrawn on 23/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 24/08/1947
WDN MEX Mexborough on 23/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1902 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 339)
13/07/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 342)
05/04/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 340)
13/03/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1842)
09/01/1926 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 642)
14/06/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 407)
23/01/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 642)
23/12/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 833)
06/07/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1912)
02/10/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 333)
26/06/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 138)
02/02/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 722)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/05/1907 13/07/1907 57 days General
Boiler number 342 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1913 05/04/1913 50 days General
Boiler number 340 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1920 13/03/1920 -71 days General  
Gorton Works 03/09/1921 26/11/1921 85 days General  
Gorton Works 24/03/1923 14/07/1923 113 days General  
Gorton Works 29/08/1925 09/01/1926 134 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6068
 
Gorton Works 29/10/1927 24/12/1927 57 days General
New right hand cylinder fitted
 
Gorton Works 03/05/1930 14/06/1930 43 days General
Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1930 23/01/1932 401 days General
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1933 23/12/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/06/1935 06/07/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1937 02/10/1937 36 days General
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1938 24/12/1938 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 25/05/1940 08/06/1940 15 days General  
Gorton Works 02/06/1943 26/06/1943 25 days General
New left hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/01/1946 02/02/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/09/1947 27/09/1947 15 days Light Repair
After collision
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1068
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6236
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
18/05/1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1907. Dep: 13/07/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 342 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
15/02/1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/02/1913. Dep: 05/04/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 340 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/01/1917 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
13/03/1920 Modification Diagram 17Sat number 1842 boiler fitted    
24/05/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1920. Dep: 13/03/1920.    
03/09/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 26/11/1921.    
24/03/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1923. Dep: 14/07/1923.    
05/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
22/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
29/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1925. Dep: 09/01/1926.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6068
   
22/02/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
27/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
26/07/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
29/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
New right hand cylinder fitted
   
14/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
03/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1930. Dep: 14/06/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1930. Dep: 23/01/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 23/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/03/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
28/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1937. Dep: 02/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
17/12/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/12/1938. Dep: 24/12/1938.    
25/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.    
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
02/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1943. Dep: 26/06/1943.
Work undertaken:
New left hand cylinder fitted
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1301 but not taken up    
12/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1946. Dep: 02/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1679    
06/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
24/08/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
13/09/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/09/1947. Dep: 27/09/1947.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
23/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1679 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev