Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 751 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4919 Week
» 20033 Month
» 323223 Year
» 1544788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1069 m/e 11/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6069   30/05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1302   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1680   24/08/1946
British Railways 61680   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B511/1902
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E884
Works Number 6237
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Sat 13/11/1948 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping During 01/1949 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 46 yrs , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1902
MEX Mexborough on 01/09/1922
DON Doncaster on 22/03/1924
LIN Lincoln on 10/06/1925
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 30/05/1936
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 06/10/1946
19D Heaton Mersey on 08/01/1947
MEX Mexborough on 24/08/1947
   Withdrawn on 13/11/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STP Heaton Mersey on 08/01/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 24/08/1947
WDN MEX Mexborough on 13/11/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1902 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 340)
14/12/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 832)
24/04/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 341)
29/06/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1288)
12/02/1916 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 826)
13/11/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 26)
12/02/1927 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1796)
01/11/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1844)
14/01/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 370)
06/10/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 553)
30/05/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 722)
05/11/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 148)
27/07/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 874)
28/08/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 148)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/11/1907 14/12/1907 36 days General
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/03/1909 24/04/1909 50 days General
Boiler number 341 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1912 29/06/1912 50 days General
Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1915 12/02/1916 71 days General
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 21/08/1920 13/11/1920 85 days General
Boiler number 26 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/10/1922 23/12/1922 71 days General  
Gorton Works 28/02/1925 30/05/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6069
 
Gorton Works 20/11/1926 12/02/1927 85 days General
Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/12/1928 09/02/1929 57 days General  
Gorton Works 20/09/1930 01/11/1930 43 days General
Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/12/1932 14/01/1933 29 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/09/1934 06/10/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1936 30/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1938 05/11/1938 29 days General
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1940 27/07/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1942 13/06/1942 27 days Light Repair
New left hand cylinder fitted
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1943 28/08/1943 16 days General
Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1946 24/08/1946 29 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1680
 
Gorton Works 13/11/1948 13/11/1948 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1069
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6237
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
09/11/1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1907. Dep: 14/12/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
06/03/1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1909. Dep: 24/04/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 341 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
11/05/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1912. Dep: 29/06/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/12/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1915. Dep: 12/02/1916.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
21/08/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/08/1920. Dep: 13/11/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 26 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
01/09/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
14/10/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/10/1922. Dep: 23/12/1922.    
22/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 30/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6069
   
10/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
20/11/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1926. Dep: 12/02/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
15/12/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/12/1928. Dep: 09/02/1929.    
20/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/12/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/12/1932. Dep: 14/01/1933.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 370 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
22/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 553 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
16/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/05/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
08/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
29/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/05/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/05/1942. Dep: 13/06/1942.
Work undertaken:
New left hand cylinder fitted
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
13/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1302 but not taken up    
27/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1946 2nd) number 1680
   
06/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
08/01/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (19D)    
24/08/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61680 but not taken up    
13/11/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1680 from Mexborough (MEX)    
13/11/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 13/11/1948. Dep: 13/11/1948.    

prev prev