Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 1072 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2106 Week
» 24612 Month
» 327802 Year
» 1549367 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 1070 m/e 11/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6070   19/04/1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B511/1902
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E884
Works Number 6238
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Mon 06/03/1939 off Lincoln (LIN)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 36 yrs, 4 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1902
MEX Mexborough m/e 05/1922
LIN Lincoln on 30/06/1931
IMM Immingham on 21/07/1931
LIN Lincoln on 07/07/1937
IMM Immingham on 02/09/1937
LIN Lincoln on 16/05/1938
   Withdrawn on 06/03/1939

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1902 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 341)
13/11/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 828)
20/09/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 342)
23/06/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 830)
19/04/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1796)
07/08/1926 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1842)
06/06/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 26)
20/01/1934 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 468A)
02/05/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 911)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 05/10/1909 13/11/1909 40 days General
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1913 20/09/1913 113 days General
Boiler number 342 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1917 23/06/1917 85 days General
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1921 14/01/1922 99 days General  
Gorton Works 23/02/1924 19/04/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6070
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1926 07/08/1926 113 days General
Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 10/11/1928 22/12/1928 43 days General  
Gorton Works 02/05/1931 06/06/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 26 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/12/1933 20/01/1934 50 days General
Boiler number 468A (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/04/1936 02/05/1936 29 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1937 13/03/1937 29 days General  
Gorton Works 04/02/1939 04/02/1939 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1070
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6238
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
05/10/1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1909. Dep: 13/11/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 828 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
31/05/1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1913. Dep: 20/09/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 342 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
31/03/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1917. Dep: 23/06/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
08/10/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1921. Dep: 14/01/1922.    
05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
23/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 19/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6070
   
17/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1926. Dep: 07/08/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1928. Dep: 22/12/1928.    
02/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 26 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
30/06/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
21/07/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
02/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1933. Dep: 20/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 468A (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937.    
07/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
02/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
16/05/1938 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
04/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/02/1939. Dep: 04/02/1939.    
06/03/1939 Withdrawn Condemned as 6070 from Lincoln (LIN)    

prev prev