Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 380 Today
» 1270 Yesterday
» 6743 Week
» 9325 Month
» 273958 Year
» 1495523 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1071 m/e 11/1902
LNER (1923 Int) 1071C   15/09/1923
LNER (1924) 6071   11/07/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1303   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1681   30/08/1946
BR 61681   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B511/1902
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E884
Works Number 6239
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Wed 23/06/1948 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping During 07/1948 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 45 yrs, 7 mths , 23 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 26/6/48 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1902
MEX Mexborough 28/07/1922
DON Doncaster 26/02/1924
IMM Immingham 18/07/1925
WFD Woodford Halse 18/07/1928
GOR Gorton 24/07/1939
MEX Mexborough 16/04/1943
LIN Lincoln 22/12/1946
MEX Mexborough 14/07/1947
   Withdrawn 23/06/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC MEX Mexborough 14/07/1947
WDN MEX Mexborough 23/06/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1902 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 342)
16/02/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 739)
06/12/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 831)
05/11/1921 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 165)
11/07/1925 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1901)
17/03/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 899)
23/07/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 830)
21/07/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1842)
15/02/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3723)
23/09/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 723)
02/01/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 849)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/12/1906 16/02/1907 71 days General
Boiler number 739 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 01/11/1913 06/12/1913 36 days General
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 07/05/1921 05/11/1921 183 days General
Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1923 15/09/1923 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 1071C
 
Gorton Works 02/05/1925 11/07/1925 71 days General
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6071
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1927 17/03/1928 85 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1930 08/03/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 09/07/1932 23/07/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1934 21/07/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1936 15/02/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 3723 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/05/1937 19/06/1937 36 days General  
Gorton Works 16/09/1939 23/09/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1942 02/01/1943 31 days General
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/10/1946 07/12/1946 50 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 1071
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6239
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
08/12/1906 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/12/1906. Dep: 16/02/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 739 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
01/11/1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1913. Dep: 06/12/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
07/05/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
28/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
30/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1923. Dep: 15/09/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 1071C
   
26/02/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
02/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 11/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6071
   
18/07/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/12/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1927. Dep: 17/03/1928.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
01/02/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1930. Dep: 08/03/1930.    
09/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1932. Dep: 23/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 21/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1936. Dep: 15/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3723 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/05/1937. Dep: 19/06/1937.    
24/07/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
16/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1303 but not taken up    
30/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1681    
19/10/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1946. Dep: 07/12/1946.    
22/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
14/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61681 but not taken up    
23/06/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1681 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev