Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 936 Yesterday
» 2970 Week
» 20306 Month
» 298102 Year
» 1182483 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 1072 m/e 11/1902
LNER (1924) 6072   09/05/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1304   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1682   01/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B511/1902
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E884
Works Number 6240
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Thu 14/08/1947 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 44 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
MEX Mexborough 19/05/1922
DON Doncaster 19/05/1924
LIN Lincoln 02/01/1931
IMM Immingham 15/12/1936
DON Doncaster 15/03/1940
MEX Mexborough 18/03/1940
   Withdrawn 14/08/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN MEX Mexborough 14/08/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1902 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 343)
29/01/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 832)
07/08/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1901)
09/05/1925 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1770)
03/05/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 336)
19/03/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 725)
30/09/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 495)
27/07/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 833)
18/06/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 910)
24/02/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 894)
05/12/1942 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 901)
21/10/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 830)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 13/01/1910 29/01/1910 17 days General
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 10/01/1920 07/08/1920 211 days General
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1922 10/02/1923 57 days General  
Gorton Works 28/02/1925 09/05/1925 71 days General
Boiler number 1770 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6072
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1927 17/12/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 22/03/1930 03/05/1930 43 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/02/1932 19/03/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1933 30/09/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 07/07/1934 04/08/1934 29 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 22/06/1935 27/07/1935 36 days General
21in type 8K cylinders fitted
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1938 18/06/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/02/1940 24/02/1940 15 days General
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1942 05/12/1942 22 days General
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1944 21/10/1944 19 days General
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as GCR Number 1072
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 6240
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
13/01/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1910. Dep: 29/01/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 832 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
10/01/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1920. Dep: 07/08/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
16/12/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1922. Dep: 10/02/1923.    
19/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
28/02/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/02/1925. Dep: 09/05/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1770 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 6072
   
22/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 17/12/1927.    
22/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 336 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/01/1931 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
27/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/02/1932. Dep: 19/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
16/09/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1933. Dep: 30/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
07/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/07/1934. Dep: 04/08/1934.    
22/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 27/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
21in type 8K cylinders fitted
Boiler number 833 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/12/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
28/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
10/02/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/02/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
14/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1942. Dep: 05/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
03/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 21/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1304 but not taken up    
01/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1682    
14/08/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1682 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev