Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 730 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3873 Week
» 14043 Month
» 291839 Year
» 1176220 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 180 m/e 01/1904
LNER (1924) 5180   06/12/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1305   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1683   12/05/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B501/1904
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9032
Works Number 4531
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1904
Withdrawal Tue 23/12/1947 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 27/12/47 but cut up at Dukinfeld

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 19/05/1922
DON Doncaster 26/07/1927
WFD Woodford Halse 08/07/1929
ARD Ardsley 30/07/1930
WFD Woodford Halse 21/08/1930
MEX Mexborough 19/04/1943
LIN Lincoln 29/12/1946
MEX Mexborough 14/07/1947
   Withdrawn 23/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln 29/12/1946
ALLOC MEX Mexborough 14/07/1947
WDN MEX Mexborough 23/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 825)
04/04/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 340)
07/12/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1335)
04/01/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1770)
06/12/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 827)
02/04/1927 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1891)
07/02/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 728)
11/03/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 829)
27/10/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 901)
15/08/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1777)
20/08/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 640)
04/09/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 722)
27/10/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 875)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/02/1908 04/04/1908 43 days General
Boiler number 340 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1912 07/12/1912 29 days General
Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1918 04/01/1919 302 days General
Boiler number 1770 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1920 20/11/1920 50 days General  
Gorton Works 13/01/1923 28/04/1923 106 days General  
Gorton Works 11/10/1924 06/12/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 827 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5180
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1927 02/04/1927 78 days General
Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/04/1929 11/05/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 20/12/1930 07/02/1931 50 days General
Superheated boiler ftted
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1933 11/03/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1934 27/10/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1936 15/08/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1938 20/08/1938 43 days General
21 in type 8K cylinders fitted
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/11/1940 30/11/1940 29 days General  
Gorton Works 23/08/1943 04/09/1943 13 days General
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/10/1945 27/10/1945 22 days Heavy
After collision
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 180
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4531
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
22/02/1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1908. Dep: 04/04/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 340 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/11/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1912. Dep: 07/12/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/03/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1918. Dep: 04/01/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1770 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
02/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1920. Dep: 20/11/1920.    
19/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
13/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1923. Dep: 28/04/1923.    
11/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1924. Dep: 06/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 827 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5180
   
15/01/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1927. Dep: 02/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
26/07/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
06/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/04/1929. Dep: 11/05/1929.    
08/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
30/07/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
21/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
20/12/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/12/1930. Dep: 07/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler ftted
Boiler number 728 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/02/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1933. Dep: 11/03/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/10/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1934. Dep: 27/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1936. Dep: 15/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
09/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
21 in type 8K cylinders fitted
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1940. Dep: 30/11/1940.    
19/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
23/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/08/1943. Dep: 04/09/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/10/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1305 but not taken up    
12/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1683    
29/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
14/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
23/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1683 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev