Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1063 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2097 Week
» 24603 Month
» 327793 Year
» 1549358 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 181 m/e 01/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5181   28/11/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1306   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1684   22/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B501/1904
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9032
Works Number 4532
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1904 to Immingham (IMM)
Withdrawal Thu 01/05/1947 off Lincoln (LIN)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 4 mths , 0 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham (New) m/e 01/1904
LIN Lincoln on 14/01/1928
IMM Immingham on 03/02/1937
MEX Mexborough on 18/03/1940
LIN Lincoln on 22/12/1946
   Withdrawn on 01/05/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 28/12/1946
WDN LIN Lincoln on 01/05/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 826)
18/04/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 830)
15/05/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 826)
10/07/1915 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 341)
12/03/1921 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 826)
24/09/1927 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 26)
28/02/1931 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1891)
31/12/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 849)
16/06/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 911)
11/04/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1842)
19/11/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 495)
22/03/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3729)
01/01/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 874)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 18/01/1908 18/04/1908 92 days General
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1909 15/05/1909 57 days General
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 17/04/1915 10/07/1915 85 days General
Boiler number 341 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/12/1920 12/03/1921 78 days General
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 05/05/1923 21/07/1923 78 days General  
Gorton Works 15/08/1925 28/11/1925 106 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5181
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1927 24/09/1927 57 days General
Boiler number 26 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1929 13/04/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 31/01/1931 28/02/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/11/1932 31/12/1932 36 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 02/06/1934 16/06/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/03/1936 11/04/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/05/1936 30/05/1936 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 01/05/1937 29/05/1937 29 days General  
Gorton Works 22/10/1938 19/11/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1941 22/03/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 05/07/1941 02/08/1941 29 days Light Repair
Right hand cylinder renewed
 
Gorton Works 11/12/1943 01/01/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 01/05/1947 01/05/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 181
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4532
Allocated to Immingham (IMM)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
18/01/1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1908. Dep: 18/04/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
20/03/1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1909. Dep: 15/05/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
17/04/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1915. Dep: 10/07/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 341 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/12/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1920. Dep: 12/03/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 826 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
05/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1923. Dep: 21/07/1923.    
15/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1925. Dep: 28/11/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5181
   
30/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 26 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
14/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
09/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 13/04/1929.    
31/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 28/02/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
26/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1932. Dep: 31/12/1932.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 849 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
02/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/06/1934. Dep: 16/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/03/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1936. Dep: 11/04/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1842 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936.    
03/02/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
01/05/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1937. Dep: 29/05/1937.    
22/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1938. Dep: 19/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
22/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
05/07/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/07/1941. Dep: 02/08/1941.
Work undertaken:
Right hand cylinder renewed
   
11/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1943. Dep: 01/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1306 but not taken up    
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1684    
22/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
01/05/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1684 from Lincoln (LIN)    
01/05/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 01/05/1947. Dep: 01/05/1947.    

prev prev