Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 825 Today
» 834 Yesterday
» 3385 Week
» 16418 Month
» 238819 Year
» 1123200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 182 m/e 01/1904
LNER (1924) 5182   12/07/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1307   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1685   27/10/1946
BR 61685   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B501/1904
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9032
Works Number 4533
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1904
Withdrawal Sat 06/03/1948 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 44 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
LIN Lincoln 14/01/1928
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 03/02/1936
SHF Sheffield Darnall 11/04/1943
MEX Mexborough 31/05/1943
LIN Lincoln 22/12/1946
MEX Mexborough 14/07/1947
   Withdrawn 06/03/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC MEX Mexborough 14/07/1947
WDN MEX Mexborough 06/03/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 827)
27/08/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 829)
21/12/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 341)
01/05/1915 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 343)
20/03/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1844)
27/05/1922 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
30/06/1926 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1777)
31/12/1930 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1796)
15/04/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1901)
06/02/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 723)
20/05/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 841)
24/07/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3721)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/07/1909 27/08/1909 38 days General
Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1912 21/12/1912 57 days General
Boiler number 341 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 02/01/1915 01/05/1915 120 days General
Boiler number 343 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 07/06/1919 20/03/1920 288 days General
Ash ejector fitted
Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 08/04/1922 27/05/1922 50 days General
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1924 12/07/1924 120 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5182
 
Gorton Works 20/02/1926 30/06/1926 131 days General
Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 13/08/1927 08/10/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 26/01/1929 16/03/1929 50 days General  
Gorton Works 22/11/1930 31/12/1930 40 days General
Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 11/03/1933 15/04/1933 36 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/10/1933 18/11/1933 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 23/03/1935 13/04/1935 22 days General  
Gorton Works 16/01/1937 06/02/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/05/1939 20/05/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1941 13/12/1941 30 days General  
Gorton Works 26/06/1943 24/07/1943 29 days General
Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1946 29/06/1946 43 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 25/10/1947 25/10/1947 1 day Light Repair
Right hand cylinder fractured
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 182
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4533
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
21/07/1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1909. Dep: 27/08/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
26/10/1912 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1912. Dep: 21/12/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 341 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
02/01/1915 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/01/1915. Dep: 01/05/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 343 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
07/06/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1919. Dep: 20/03/1920.
Work undertaken:
Ash ejector fitted
Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
08/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1922. Dep: 27/05/1922.
Work undertaken:
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
15/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5182
   
20/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1926. Dep: 30/06/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
13/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/08/1927. Dep: 08/10/1927.    
14/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
26/01/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1929. Dep: 16/03/1929.    
22/11/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/11/1930. Dep: 31/12/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
11/03/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 15/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 1901 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/10/1933. Dep: 18/11/1933.    
23/03/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935.    
03/02/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
16/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1937. Dep: 06/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/05/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1939. Dep: 20/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
14/11/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1941. Dep: 13/12/1941.    
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
31/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
26/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1943. Dep: 24/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3721 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1307 but not taken up    
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946.    
27/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1685    
22/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
14/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
25/10/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/10/1947. Dep: 25/10/1947.
Work undertaken:
Right hand cylinder fractured
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61685 but not taken up    
06/03/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1685 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev