Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 161 Today
» 1053 Yesterday
» 5382 Week
» 20496 Month
» 323686 Year
» 1545251 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 183 m/e 02/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5183   04/04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1308   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1686   31/03/1946
British Railways 61686   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B502/1904
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9032
Works Number 4534
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1904
Withdrawal Mon 12/06/1950 off Mexborough (36B)
Scrapping During 09/1950 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 46 yrs, 4 mths , 12 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 17/6/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1904
IMM Immingham on 19/05/1922
ARD Ardsley on 05/01/1924
GOR Gorton on 15/04/1924
LIN Lincoln on 20/04/1925
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 20/06/1936
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
TFD Trafford Park (LNER) on 06/10/1946
MEX Mexborough on 24/08/1947
   Withdrawn on 12/06/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 24/08/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 828)
09/11/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 338)
04/11/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 343)
23/01/1915 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 825)
04/08/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 342)
01/02/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1777)
16/06/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 468)
22/06/1929 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 439)
03/06/1933 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 418)
13/07/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 903)
18/06/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 875)
09/12/1939 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 899)
20/02/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 837)
14/10/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3733)
15/03/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3729)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 21/09/1907 09/11/1907 50 days General
Boiler number 338 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1911 04/11/1911 93 days General
Boiler number 343 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 12/12/1914 23/01/1915 43 days General
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1917 04/08/1917 43 days General
Boiler number 342 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 14/09/1919 01/12/1919 79 days General  
Gorton Works 30/10/1920 25/12/1920 57 days General  
Gorton Works 20/01/1923 16/06/1923 148 days General
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1925 04/04/1925 64 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5183
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1927 26/11/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 18/05/1929 22/06/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 439 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 07/03/1931 11/04/1931 36 days General  
Gorton Works 06/05/1933 03/06/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 22/06/1935 13/07/1935 22 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/05/1936 20/06/1936 43 days General
21 in type 8K cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 21/05/1938 18/06/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/11/1939 09/12/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1943 20/02/1943 30 days General
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 03/10/1944 14/10/1944 12 days General
Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1947 15/03/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 183
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4534
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
21/09/1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1907. Dep: 09/11/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 338 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
04/08/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1911. Dep: 04/11/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 343 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
12/12/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1914. Dep: 23/01/1915.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
23/06/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1917. Dep: 04/08/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 342 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
01/02/1919 Modification Diagram 17Sat number 1777 boiler fitted    
14/09/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1919. Dep: 01/12/1919.    
30/10/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1920. Dep: 25/12/1920.    
19/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
20/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1923. Dep: 16/06/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
05/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
15/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
31/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1925. Dep: 04/04/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5183
   
20/04/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
01/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927.    
18/05/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1929. Dep: 22/06/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 439 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
07/03/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931.    
06/05/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
22/06/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 903 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
09/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936.
Work undertaken:
21 in type 8K cylinders fitted
   
20/06/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
21/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
22/01/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/10/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1308 but not taken up    
31/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1686    
06/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD)    
08/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/08/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61686 but not taken up    
12/06/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 1686 from Mexborough (36B)    

prev prev