|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 21/09/1907 | 09/11/1907 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 338 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/08/1911 | 04/11/1911 | 93 days | General | Boiler number 343 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/12/1914 | 23/01/1915 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1917 | 04/08/1917 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 342 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/09/1919 | 01/12/1919 | 79 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 30/10/1920 | 25/12/1920 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1923 | 16/06/1923 | 148 days | General | Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/01/1925 | 04/04/1925 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5183 |
||
Gorton Works | 01/10/1927 | 26/11/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1929 | 22/06/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 439 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1931 | 11/04/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/05/1933 | 03/06/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/06/1935 | 13/07/1935 | 22 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 903 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/05/1936 | 20/06/1936 | 43 days | General | 21 in type 8K cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 21/05/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/11/1939 | 09/12/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/10/1944 | 14/10/1944 | 12 days | General | Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1947 | 15/03/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 183 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4534 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
21/09/1907 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1907. Dep: 09/11/1907. Work undertaken: Boiler number 338 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
04/08/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1911. Dep: 04/11/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 343 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
12/12/1914 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/12/1914. Dep: 23/01/1915. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
23/06/1917 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1917. Dep: 04/08/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 342 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
01/02/1919 | Modification | Diagram 17Sat number 1777 boiler fitted | ||
14/09/1919 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/09/1919. Dep: 01/12/1919. | ||
30/10/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/10/1920. Dep: 25/12/1920. | ||
19/05/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
20/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1923. Dep: 16/06/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 468 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
05/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
15/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1925. Dep: 04/04/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5183 |
||
20/04/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
01/10/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1927. Dep: 26/11/1927. | ||
18/05/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1929. Dep: 22/06/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 439 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
07/03/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1931. Dep: 11/04/1931. | ||
06/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 03/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 418 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
22/06/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1935. Dep: 13/07/1935. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 903 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
09/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/05/1936. Dep: 20/06/1936. Work undertaken: 21 in type 8K cylinders fitted |
||
20/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
21/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/05/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 875 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
18/11/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/11/1939. Dep: 09/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 899 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
22/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
03/10/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/10/1944. Dep: 14/10/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3733 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1308 but not taken up | ||
31/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1686 | ||
06/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LNER) (TFD) | ||
08/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/08/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61686 but not taken up | ||
12/06/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1686 from Mexborough (36B) | ||
09/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton |