|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 06/02/1909 | 06/03/1909 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/11/1910 | 14/01/1911 | 65 days | General | Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1916 | 20/01/1917 | 253 days | General | Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 16/09/1923 | 09/06/1923 | -98 days | General | 8K superheated boiler & side window cab fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 19/01/1924 | 26/01/1924 | 8 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5184 |
||
Gorton Works | 24/05/1924 | 02/08/1924 | 71 days | General | 21in type 8K cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 18/07/1925 | 03/10/1925 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 06/08/1927 | 10/12/1927 | 127 days | General | 8A boiler & ordinary cab fitted Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/04/1929 | 25/05/1929 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/05/1931 | 20/06/1931 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/12/1933 | 20/01/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/04/1936 | 16/05/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/05/1938 | 28/05/1938 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1940 | 03/02/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/02/1941 | 22/02/1941 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 16/04/1943 | 08/05/1943 | 23 days | General | Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/05/1946 | 29/06/1946 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/07/1947 | 04/07/1947 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 184 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4535 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
06/02/1909 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1909. Dep: 06/03/1909. Work undertaken: Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
11/11/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1910. Dep: 14/01/1911. Work undertaken: Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
13/05/1916 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1916. Dep: 20/01/1917. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
19/05/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/06/1923 | Modification | Diagram 15 number 1514 boiler fitted | ||
16/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1923. Dep: 09/06/1923. Work undertaken: 8K superheated boiler & side window cab fitted |
||
05/01/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD) | ||
19/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1924. Dep: 26/01/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5184 |
||
16/04/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
24/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1924. Dep: 02/08/1924. Work undertaken: 21in type 8K cylinders fitted |
||
18/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1925. Dep: 03/10/1925. | ||
08/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
06/08/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
06/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927. Work undertaken: 8A boiler & ordinary cab fitted Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
20/04/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 25/05/1929. | ||
30/05/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/07/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
25/09/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
23/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
23/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1933. Dep: 20/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
25/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
06/07/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
03/09/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
14/05/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 28/05/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
13/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
15/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
18/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
15/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
16/04/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1309 but not taken up | ||
18/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
22/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1687 | ||
04/07/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1687 from Mexborough (MEX) | ||
04/07/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/07/1947. Dep: 04/07/1947. |