Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 237 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 237 Week
» 17573 Month
» 295369 Year
» 1179750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 184 m/e 02/1904
LNER (1924) 5184   26/01/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1309   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1687   22/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B502/1904
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9032
Works Number 4535
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1904
Withdrawal Fri 04/07/1947 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 43 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
IMM Immingham 19/05/1922
ARD Ardsley 05/01/1924
GOR Gorton 16/04/1924
IMM Immingham 08/10/1925
WFD Woodford Halse 06/08/1926
IMM Immingham 30/05/1929
LIN Lincoln 24/07/1930
IMM Immingham 25/09/1930
LIN Lincoln 06/07/1937
IMM Immingham 03/09/1937
DON Doncaster 15/03/1940
MEX Mexborough 18/03/1940
   Withdrawn 04/07/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN MEX Mexborough 04/07/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 829)
06/03/1909 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 825)
14/01/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 830)
20/01/1917 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1288)
09/06/1923 Diagram 15 boiler fitted (number 1514)
10/12/1927 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 837)
20/06/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 910)
20/01/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 589)
16/05/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 640)
28/05/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 894)
03/02/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 650)
08/05/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3727)
29/06/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 138)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 06/02/1909 06/03/1909 29 days General
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1910 14/01/1911 65 days General
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 13/05/1916 20/01/1917 253 days General
Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 16/09/1923 09/06/1923 -98 days General
8K superheated boiler & side window cab fitted
 
Gorton Works 19/01/1924 26/01/1924 8 days Light Repair
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5184
 
Gorton Works 24/05/1924 02/08/1924 71 days General
21in type 8K cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 18/07/1925 03/10/1925 78 days General  
Gorton Works 06/08/1927 10/12/1927 127 days General
8A boiler & ordinary cab fitted
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1929 25/05/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 23/05/1931 20/06/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/12/1933 20/01/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/04/1936 16/05/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1938 28/05/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 13/01/1940 03/02/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/02/1941 22/02/1941 8 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 16/04/1943 08/05/1943 23 days General
Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1946 29/06/1946 43 days General
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 04/07/1947 04/07/1947 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 184
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4535
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
06/02/1909 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1909. Dep: 06/03/1909.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
11/11/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1910. Dep: 14/01/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 830 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
13/05/1916 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1916. Dep: 20/01/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1288 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
19/05/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
09/06/1923 Modification Diagram 15 number 1514 boiler fitted    
16/09/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/09/1923. Dep: 09/06/1923.
Work undertaken:
8K superheated boiler & side window cab fitted
   
05/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
19/01/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/01/1924. Dep: 26/01/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5184
   
16/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/05/1924. Dep: 02/08/1924.
Work undertaken:
21in type 8K cylinders fitted
   
18/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/07/1925. Dep: 03/10/1925.    
08/10/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
06/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
06/08/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1927. Dep: 10/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
8A boiler & ordinary cab fitted
Boiler number 837 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
20/04/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1929. Dep: 25/05/1929.    
30/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
24/07/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
25/09/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
23/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 910 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/12/1933. Dep: 20/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 589 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/04/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1936. Dep: 16/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 640 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
06/07/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
03/09/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
14/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 28/05/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
13/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1940. Dep: 03/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 650 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
18/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
15/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/02/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
16/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/04/1943. Dep: 08/05/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3727 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1309 but not taken up    
18/05/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 138 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
22/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1687    
04/07/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1687 from Mexborough (MEX)    
04/07/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 04/07/1947. Dep: 04/07/1947.    

prev prev