Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 131 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4262 Week
» 14432 Month
» 292228 Year
» 1176609 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 185 m/e 02/1904
LNER (1923 Int) 185C   01/12/1923
LNER (1924) 5185   04/07/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1310   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1688   26/05/1946
BR 61688   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B502/1904
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9032
Works Number 4536
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1904 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 31/10/1949 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 45 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) m/e 02/1904
ARD Ardsley 05/01/1924
IMM Immingham 24/04/1924
LIN Lincoln 15/08/1924
WFD Woodford Halse 16/06/1930
ARD Ardsley 24/07/1930
LIN Lincoln 22/08/1930
MEX Mexborough 18/03/1940
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 17/06/1947
MEX Mexborough 07/09/1947
   Withdrawn 31/10/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BED   17/06/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough 07/09/1947
WDN MEX Mexborough 03/11/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 830)
21/03/1908 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 831)
27/05/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 825)
07/11/1914 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 739)
27/03/1920 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1891)
10/06/1922 Ross Pop safety valves fitted
01/12/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 495)
26/05/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 848)
13/02/1932 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 407)
12/08/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 1912)
09/03/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 723)
16/01/1937 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 841)
26/11/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 722)
01/03/1941 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3728)
12/02/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3729)
08/03/1947 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3738)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 04/01/1908 21/03/1908 78 days General
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1911 27/05/1911 64 days General
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 26/09/1914 07/11/1914 43 days General
Boiler number 739 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/08/1919 27/03/1920 232 days General
Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/04/1922 10/06/1922 57 days General
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
 
Gorton Works 13/10/1923 01/12/1923 50 days General
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 185C
 
Gorton Works 28/03/1925 04/07/1925 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5185
 
Gorton Works 18/02/1928 26/05/1928 99 days General
Superheated boiler & 21in type 8K cylinders fitted
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1929 14/12/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 30/01/1932 13/02/1932 15 days General
Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1933 12/08/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 23/02/1935 09/03/1935 15 days General
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1936 16/01/1937 17 days General
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1938 26/11/1938 15 days General
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1941 01/03/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 3728 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 17/03/1942 28/03/1942 12 days General
After collision
 
Gorton Works 22/01/1944 12/02/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 01/02/1947 08/03/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 3738 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 31/10/1949 31/10/1949 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as GCR Number 185
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4536
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
04/01/1908 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1908. Dep: 21/03/1908.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/03/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1911. Dep: 27/05/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 825 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
26/09/1914 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1914. Dep: 07/11/1914.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 739 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/08/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1919. Dep: 27/03/1920.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
15/04/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/04/1922. Dep: 10/06/1922.
Work undertaken:
Ross Pop safety valves fitted
   
13/10/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/10/1923. Dep: 01/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 185C
   
05/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
24/04/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
15/08/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
28/03/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5185
   
18/02/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/02/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler & 21in type 8K cylinders fitted
Boiler number 848 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
09/11/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1929. Dep: 14/12/1929.    
16/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/07/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
22/08/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
30/01/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1932. Dep: 13/02/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 407 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
22/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 12/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1912 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
23/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1935. Dep: 09/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 723 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/12/1936. Dep: 16/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 841 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
12/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 722 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
08/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1941. Dep: 01/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3728 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
17/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/03/1942. Dep: 28/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
22/01/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3729 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1310 but not taken up    
26/05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1688    
01/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1947. Dep: 08/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3738 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
17/06/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
07/09/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61688 but not taken up    
31/10/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1688 from Mexborough (MEX)    
31/10/1949 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/10/1949. Dep: 31/10/1949.    

prev prev