Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 430 Today
» 1031 Yesterday
» 7437 Week
» 13571 Month
» 241455 Year
» 1463020 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 186 m/e 02/1904
LNER (1924) 5186   24/10/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1311 on 31/01/1946
LNER (1946 2nd) 1689 on 24/03/1946
BR 61689 on Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B502/1904
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9032
Works Number 4537
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1904
Withdrawal Wed 19/10/1949 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping During 12/1949 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 45 yrs, 8 mths , 18 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 22/10/49 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1904
MEX Mexborough 15/12/1922
ARD Ardsley 05/01/1924
GOR Gorton 07/01/1924
IMM Immingham 04/03/1924
WFD Woodford Halse 07/08/1926
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 31/03/1936
SHF Sheffield Darnall 11/04/1943
MEX Mexborough 31/05/1943
LIN Lincoln 22/12/1946
MEX Mexborough 14/07/1947
   Withdrawn 19/10/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LIN Lincoln w/e 28/12/1946
ALLOC MEX Mexborough 14/07/1947
WDN MEX Mexborough 17/10/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 831)
23/11/1907 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 339)
02/09/1911 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 831)
08/03/1913 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 829)
09/08/1919 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1796)
14/07/1923 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1777)
24/10/1925 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 165)
28/01/1928 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 893)
20/06/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 916)
04/02/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 901)
29/09/1934 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 47)
30/05/1936 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 894)
19/03/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 525)
10/06/1944 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 3728)
14/09/1946 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 869)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/10/1907 23/11/1907 36 days General
Boiler number 339 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/06/1911 02/09/1911 71 days General
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 08/02/1913 08/03/1913 29 days General
Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1919 09/08/1919 197 days General
Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1921 22/10/1921 78 days General  
Gorton Works 05/05/1923 14/07/1923 71 days General
Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 15/08/1925 24/10/1925 71 days General
Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5186
 
Gorton Works 05/12/1925 30/01/1926 57 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 19/11/1927 28/01/1928 71 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1929 14/09/1929 50 days General  
Gorton Works 16/05/1931 20/06/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 22997 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 21/01/1933 04/02/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 15/09/1934 29/09/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 16/05/1936 30/05/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 19/02/1938 19/03/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/01/1941 22/02/1941 29 days General  
Gorton Works 11/06/1942 27/06/1942 17 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/05/1944 10/06/1944 29 days General
Boiler number 3728 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 10/08/1946 14/09/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 186
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4537
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
19/10/1907 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1907. Dep: 23/11/1907.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 339 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
24/06/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1911. Dep: 02/09/1911.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 831 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
08/02/1913 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1913. Dep: 08/03/1913.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 829 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/01/1919 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1919. Dep: 09/08/1919.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1796 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
06/08/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1921. Dep: 22/10/1921.    
15/12/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
05/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/05/1923. Dep: 14/07/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1777 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
05/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
07/01/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
04/03/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
15/08/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1925. Dep: 24/10/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 165 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5186
   
05/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/12/1925. Dep: 30/01/1926.    
07/08/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
19/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1927. Dep: 28/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1929. Dep: 14/09/1929.    
16/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1931. Dep: 20/06/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 22997 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
21/01/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1933. Dep: 04/02/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 901 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
15/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1934. Dep: 29/09/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 47 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/03/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
16/05/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 894 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
19/02/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 525 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/01/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941.    
11/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/06/1942. Dep: 27/06/1942.    
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
31/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
13/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1944. Dep: 10/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3728 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
31/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1311    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1689    
10/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1946. Dep: 14/09/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 869 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
22/12/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
14/07/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61689 but not taken up    
19/10/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1689 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev prev