Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 993 Today
» 1034 Yesterday
» 2027 Week
» 24533 Month
» 327723 Year
» 1549288 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 187 m/e 03/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5187   26/04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1312 on 27/01/1946
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1690 on 24/03/1946
British Railways 61690 on Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B5
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B503/1904
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number 9032
Works Number 4538
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 03/1904
Withdrawal Tue 20/04/1948 off Mexborough (MEX)
Scrapping During 07/1948 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 44 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 24/4/48 but cut up at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1904
LIN Lincoln on 28/07/1922
IMM Immingham on 30/06/1936
MEX Mexborough on 18/03/1940
   Withdrawn on 20/04/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NTH Northwich w/e 20/12/1947
WDN MEX Mexborough on 20/04/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1904 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 832)
04/06/1910 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1335)
27/01/1912 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 339)
14/12/1918 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1772)
26/04/1924 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1891)
26/12/1926 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted (number 1844)
26/07/1930 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 642)
05/09/1931 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 893)
09/12/1933 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 725)
21/09/1935 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 495)
29/10/1938 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 874)
20/07/1940 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 148)
03/07/1943 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 333)
17/11/1945 Diagram 17Sup boiler fitted (number 911)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 07/05/1910 04/06/1910 29 days General
Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/12/1911 27/01/1912 35 days General
Boiler number 339 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1918 14/12/1918 281 days General
Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 25/02/1922 20/05/1922 85 days General  
Gorton Works 16/02/1924 26/04/1924 71 days General
Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5187
 
Gorton Works 02/10/1926 26/12/1926 86 days General
Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat)
 
Gorton Works 24/11/1928 19/01/1929 57 days General  
Gorton Works 21/06/1930 26/07/1930 36 days General
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1931 05/09/1931 57 days General
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/11/1933 09/12/1933 15 days General
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1935 21/09/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 06/02/1937 13/03/1937 36 days General
21in type 8K cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1938 29/10/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1940 20/07/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 25/03/1942 11/04/1942 18 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 12/06/1943 03/07/1943 22 days General
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1943 15/01/1944 19 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1945 17/11/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
 

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
16/01/1943 Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. SLS/194302
30/11/1945 Belle Vue MPD 2700, 2971, 5180/7,5429/30, 5503, 6100, 6031 an 6575 were noted on trials ex Gorton during November. 4665 was noted on a local passenger ex Manchester (London Road). other strangers included 1992 ex G.W. SLS/194601

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1904 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 187
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4538
Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted
   
07/05/1910 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1910. Dep: 04/06/1910.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
24/12/1911 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1911. Dep: 27/01/1912.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 339 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
09/03/1918 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1918. Dep: 14/12/1918.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
25/02/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1922. Dep: 20/05/1922.    
28/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN)    
16/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5187
   
02/10/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1926. Dep: 26/12/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat)
   
24/11/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929.    
21/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930.
Work undertaken:
Superheated boiler fitted
Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
11/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 05/09/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
24/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
30/06/1936 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
06/02/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937.
Work undertaken:
21in type 8K cylinders fitted
   
08/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
18/03/1940 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
29/06/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
25/03/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942.    
12/06/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
28/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
27/10/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup)
   
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1312    
24/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1690    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61690 but not taken up    
20/04/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1690 from Mexborough (MEX)    

prev