|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 07/05/1910 | 04/06/1910 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/12/1911 | 27/01/1912 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 339 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1918 | 14/12/1918 | 281 days | General | Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/02/1922 | 20/05/1922 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 16/02/1924 | 26/04/1924 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5187 |
||
Gorton Works | 02/10/1926 | 26/12/1926 | 86 days | General | Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1928 | 19/01/1929 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 21/06/1930 | 26/07/1930 | 36 days | General | Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1931 | 05/09/1931 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1933 | 09/12/1933 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1935 | 21/09/1935 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/02/1937 | 13/03/1937 | 36 days | General | 21in type 8K cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 08/10/1938 | 29/10/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1940 | 20/07/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/03/1942 | 11/04/1942 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1943 | 03/07/1943 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1943 | 15/01/1944 | 19 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 27/10/1945 | 17/11/1945 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1945 | Belle Vue MPD | 2700, 2971, 5180/7,5429/30, 5503, 6100, 6031 an 6575 were noted on trials ex Gorton during November. 4665 was noted on a local passenger ex Manchester (London Road). other strangers included 1992 ex G.W. | SLS/194601 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1904 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 187 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 4538 Diagram 17Sat boiler fitted |
||
07/05/1910 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1910. Dep: 04/06/1910. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1335 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
24/12/1911 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/12/1911. Dep: 27/01/1912. Work undertaken: Boiler number 339 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
09/03/1918 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1918. Dep: 14/12/1918. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1772 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
25/02/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1922. Dep: 20/05/1922. | ||
28/07/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
16/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1891 (Diagram 17Sat) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5187 |
||
02/10/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/10/1926. Dep: 26/12/1926. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1844 (Diagram 17Sat) |
||
24/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929. | ||
21/06/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/06/1930. Dep: 26/07/1930. Work undertaken: Superheated boiler fitted Boiler number 642 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
11/07/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 05/09/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 893 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
25/11/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 725 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
24/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 495 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
30/06/1936 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
06/02/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1937. Dep: 13/03/1937. Work undertaken: 21in type 8K cylinders fitted |
||
08/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1938. Dep: 29/10/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 874 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
18/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
29/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 148 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
25/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 25/03/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942. | ||
12/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 03/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 333 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
28/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 28/12/1943. Dep: 15/01/1944. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
27/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1945. Dep: 17/11/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 911 (Diagram 17Sup) |
||
27/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1312 | ||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1690 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61690 but not taken up | ||
20/04/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1690 from Mexborough (MEX) | ||
07/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield |