Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 917 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3056 Week
» 13226 Month
» 291022 Year
» 1175403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 416 m/e 07/1918
LNER (1924) 5416   21/03/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1328   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1346   15/09/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B6
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B607/1918
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 07/1918
Withdrawal Fri 28/11/1947 off Ardsley (ARD)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 29 yrs, 4 mths , 29 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 14/07/1922
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 05/09/1925
GOR Gorton 23/04/1927
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 07/05/1927
ARD Ardsley 17/02/1928
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 30/04/1928
ARD Ardsley 01/10/1928
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street 15/06/1929
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 01/06/1934
SHF Sheffield Darnall 11/04/1943
ARD Ardsley 28/07/1946
   Withdrawn 28/11/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN ARD Ardsley 28/11/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1918 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1734)
09/04/1927 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1725)
29/04/1933 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 873)
06/07/1935 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1726)
06/07/1935 Intensifore lubricator removed
03/04/1937 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1792)
25/02/1939 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1789)
03/05/1941 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 3700)
13/03/1943 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 873)
31/03/1945 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1726)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/09/1920 30/10/1920 36 days General  
Gorton Works 30/09/1922 09/12/1922 71 days General  
Gorton Works 31/01/1925 21/03/1925 50 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5416
 
Gorton Works 05/02/1927 09/04/1927 64 days General
Boiler number 1725 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1929 23/03/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 07/06/1930 12/07/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 24/01/1931 28/03/1931 64 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/02/1932 05/03/1932 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 08/04/1933 29/04/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1935 06/07/1935 50 days General
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 20/03/1937 03/04/1937 15 days General
Boiler number 1792 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 11/02/1939 25/02/1939 15 days General
Boiler number 1789 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 05/04/1941 03/05/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 3700 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 17/02/1943 13/03/1943 25 days General
Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1945 31/03/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1918 To Service To service as GCR Number 416
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
25/09/1920 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/09/1920. Dep: 30/10/1920.    
14/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/09/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/09/1922. Dep: 09/12/1922.    
31/01/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1925. Dep: 21/03/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5416
   
05/09/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
05/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1725 (Diagram 15B)
   
23/04/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
07/05/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
17/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
30/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
01/10/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
16/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 23/03/1929.    
15/06/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
07/06/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/06/1930. Dep: 12/07/1930.    
24/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/01/1931. Dep: 28/03/1931.    
13/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932.    
08/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1933. Dep: 29/04/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B)
   
01/06/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
18/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 06/07/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
20/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1937. Dep: 03/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1792 (Diagram 15B)
   
11/02/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 25/02/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1789 (Diagram 15B)
   
05/04/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1941. Dep: 03/05/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3700 (Diagram 15B)
   
17/02/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/02/1943. Dep: 13/03/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 873 (Diagram 15B)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
10/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1726 (Diagram 15B)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1328 but not taken up    
28/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
15/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1346    
28/11/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1346 from Ardsley (ARD)    

prev