Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 177 Today
» 1015 Yesterday
» 4345 Week
» 19459 Month
» 322649 Year
» 1544214 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 53 m/e 04/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924 Tmp) 53C   18/08/1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5053   02/10/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 1st) 1330   Not applied
London and North Eastern Railway (1946 2nd) 1348   18/08/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B6
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B604/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 04/1921
Withdrawal Wed 31/12/1947 off Ardsley (ARD)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 26 yrs , 9 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 04/1921
GOR Gorton on 14/07/1922
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 02/02/1927
ARD Ardsley on 17/02/1928
COP Copley Hill (Leeds) on 26/03/1928
ARD Ardsley on 30/04/1928
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street on 01/02/1930
SHF Sheffield Neepsend on 26/06/1934
SHF Sheffield Darnall on 11/04/1943
ARD Ardsley on 28/07/1946
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN YK York (North) on 02/08/1947
WDN ARD Ardsley on 31/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1921 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 64)
12/01/1929 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 2)
06/10/1934 Intensifore lubricator removed
04/07/1936 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1789)
28/01/1939 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 1)
22/03/1941 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 3699)
28/08/1943 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 3700)
09/02/1946 Diagram 15B boiler fitted (number 64)


Works Visits
Works Stopped Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/06/1923 18/08/1923 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 53C
 
Gorton Works 26/06/1926 02/10/1926 99 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5053
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1929 12/01/1929 -259 days General  
Gorton Works 17/10/1931 21/11/1931 36 days General  
Gorton Works 15/09/1934 06/10/1934 22 days General
Intensifore lubricator removed
 
Gorton Works 20/06/1936 04/07/1936 15 days General
Boiler number 1789 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 19/06/1937 03/07/1937 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 21/01/1939 28/01/1939 8 days General
Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1941 22/03/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 3699 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 11/08/1943 28/08/1943 18 days General
Boiler number 3700 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1946 09/02/1946 26 days General
Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B)
 
Gorton Works 31/12/1947 31/12/1947 1 day No repairs  

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
19/08/1947 Darlington Works The following newly painted locos. were observed on shed here on 19/8: W.D. Nos. 77129, 77209, 77431, 78514 and 79204, together with 'D49' 2708 THJ. On the same day the following newly painted locos. were seen in the Works' yard: 'D49' 2738; 'Q5' 3287; 'J21' 5108; 'J24' 5604; 'J25' 5689 and ex H. & B. 'N13' 9113; whilst the following were stripped but not marked for scrapping: 'J24' 5636; 'J25' 5648/71/81/99, 5701; 'Q5' 3276/78/83/93. Further locos. also stripped were: 'D49' 2727; 'J26' 5731/60/73/77; 'Ql' 9931; W.D. Nos. 77365 (ex N.S. No. 4364) and 77162 (ex N.S. No. 4482). 'T1' 9919, 9921 and 'J77' 8429 TWD were in the Erecting Shop, whilst the frames for the new Class 'Bl' locos. were laid up to No. 1036. 'A2' 507 was in the Works yard but has since been noted in traffic while 'A2' 511 was in Stooperdale boiler yard. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77080 (ex N.S. No. 4330), 77225, 77306 and 77456 were stored in the Paint Shop with the cab fittings removed. The electric locos. that were previously stored had been removed. The scrap yard contained 'J21' 5053 which was almost completely cut up. The scrapping of 'Cl' No. 2845 had been commenced and outside the Works yard Nos. 2825, 2855 and 2879 were awaiting their doom. Owing to the large number of 'CI's' now being withdrawn it is quite impossible for them all to be broken up at Doncaster and consequently a number of these engines are being dealt with at Darlington. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1921 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 53
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 15B boiler fitted
   
14/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/06/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1923. Dep: 18/08/1923.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924 Tmp) number 53C
   
26/06/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1926. Dep: 02/10/1926.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5053
   
02/02/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
17/02/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
26/03/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP)    
30/04/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
12/01/1929 Modification Diagram 15B number 2 boiler fitted    
29/09/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1929. Dep: 12/01/1929.    
01/02/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
17/10/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1931. Dep: 21/11/1931.    
26/06/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
15/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Intensifore lubricator removed
   
20/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1789 (Diagram 15B)
   
19/06/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1937. Dep: 03/07/1937.    
21/01/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/01/1939. Dep: 28/01/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1 (Diagram 15B)
   
22/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3699 (Diagram 15B)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
11/08/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1943. Dep: 28/08/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3700 (Diagram 15B)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1330 but not taken up    
15/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 64 (Diagram 15B)
   
28/07/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (ARD)    
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1348    
31/12/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1348 from Ardsley (ARD)    
31/12/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 31/12/1947. Dep: 31/12/1947.    

prev