|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 01/09/1923 | 17/11/1923 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 73C |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1925 | 14/11/1925 | 106 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5073 |
||
Gorton Works | 09/04/1927 | 04/06/1927 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 160 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/03/1929 | 20/04/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 02/05/1931 | 06/06/1931 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 13/05/1933 | 17/06/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/02/1934 | 17/03/1934 | 29 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 17/11/1934 | 08/12/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/07/1936 | 08/08/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1938 | 19/03/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1943 | 13/02/1943 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1944 | 25/11/1944 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/05/1947 | 14/06/1947 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 73 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
25/06/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1923. Dep: 17/11/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1923 Int) number 73C |
||
01/08/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1925. Dep: 14/11/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5073 |
||
09/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/04/1927. Dep: 04/06/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 160 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/03/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929. | ||
02/05/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1931. Dep: 06/06/1931. | ||
23/06/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/08/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
13/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/05/1933. Dep: 17/06/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13) |
||
17/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/02/1934. Dep: 17/03/1934. | ||
17/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/11/1934. Dep: 08/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13) |
||
11/07/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 08/08/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/01/1937 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 19/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13) |
||
24/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13) |
||
12/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1943. Dep: 13/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 13) |
||
24/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
04/11/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1944. Dep: 25/11/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/07/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
21/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1361 | ||
03/05/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1947. Dep: 14/06/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3037 (Diagram 13) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61361 but not taken up | ||
04/03/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1361 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
11/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield |