Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 776 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 776 Week
» 18112 Month
» 295908 Year
» 1180289 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 36 m/e 09/1921
LNER (1924) 5036   17/05/1924
LNER (1946) 1363   04/10/1946
BR (BR 1st) 61363   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/109/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3478
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1921
Withdrawal Sat 12/06/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping During 09/1948 at Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 26 yrs, 9 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden 04/11/1921
IMM Immingham 03/02/1922
WFD Woodford Halse 12/01/1923
GOR Gorton 24/05/1924
ANN Annesley 10/06/1925
CLK Colwick 04/03/1926
GOR Gorton 01/04/1926
NEA Neasden 05/12/1939
WFD Woodford Halse 24/12/1939
GOR Gorton 30/10/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall 25/06/1945
   Withdrawn 12/06/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall 12/06/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1921)
30/10/1926 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 73)
27/10/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 263)
27/08/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 354)
23/06/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1934)
30/11/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3005)
24/04/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1849)
06/05/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3006)
25/05/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3021)
09/05/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 244)
24/11/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3011)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 08/03/1924 17/05/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5036
 
Gorton Works 14/08/1926 30/10/1926 78 days General
Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1928 27/10/1928 127 days General
Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1930 19/07/1930 50 days General  
Gorton Works 06/08/1932 27/08/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/05/1934 23/06/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/11/1935 30/11/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/03/1937 24/04/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/04/1939 06/05/1939 36 days General
Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1940 25/05/1940 43 days General
Four new cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1942 09/05/1942 27 days General
Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/12/1943 19/02/1944 52 days General  
Gorton Works 03/11/1945 24/11/1945 22 days General
Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1947 11/01/1947 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 08/03/1947 22/03/1947 15 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 21/06/1947 21/06/1947 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 12/06/1948 12/06/1948 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1921 To Service To service as GCR Number 36
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3478
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
04/11/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
03/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
12/01/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
08/03/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5036
   
24/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
10/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
04/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
01/04/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
14/08/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/08/1926. Dep: 30/10/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13)
   
23/06/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1928. Dep: 27/10/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
   
31/05/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1930. Dep: 19/07/1930.    
06/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1932. Dep: 27/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
   
26/05/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1934. Dep: 23/06/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1934 (Diagram 13)
   
09/11/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1935. Dep: 30/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
   
27/03/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1937. Dep: 24/04/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
   
01/04/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1939. Dep: 06/05/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3006 (Diagram 13)
   
05/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
24/12/1939 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
13/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 25/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
Four new cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3021 (Diagram 13)
   
13/04/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1943. Dep: 19/02/1944.    
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/11/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13)
   
04/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1363    
11/01/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1947. Dep: 11/01/1947.    
08/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
21/06/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1947. Dep: 21/06/1947.    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61363 but not taken up    
12/06/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1363 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
12/06/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 12/06/1948. Dep: 12/06/1948.    
09/1948 Scrapped Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield    

prev prev