Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 237 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 237 Week
» 17573 Month
» 295369 Year
» 1179750 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 38 m/e 10/1921
LNER (1924) 5038   22/03/1924
LNER (1946) 1365   31/07/1946
BR (BR 1st) 61365   Not applied
BR (BR 2nd) 61702   07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/110/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3480
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1921
Withdrawal Mon 13/06/1949 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 27 yrs, 8 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden 14/10/1921
GOR Gorton 03/02/1922
IMM Immingham 28/07/1922
WFD Woodford Halse 28/01/1923
GOR Gorton 30/10/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall 25/06/1945
   Withdrawn 13/06/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall 13/06/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1923)
24/04/1926 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 610)
30/03/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 424)
05/03/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 554)
09/12/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 345)
12/10/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 554)
27/02/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 424)
20/08/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 576)
27/07/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3020)
12/12/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 791)
20/01/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3003)
26/04/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 81)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 24/11/1923 22/03/1924 120 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5038
 
Gorton Works 13/02/1926 24/04/1926 71 days General
Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/07/1927 24/09/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 09/02/1929 30/03/1929 50 days General
Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/09/1930 08/11/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 06/02/1932 05/03/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1933 09/12/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 345 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/08/1935 12/10/1935 43 days General
New inside cylinders fitted
Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/01/1937 27/02/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1938 20/08/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/07/1940 27/07/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/11/1940 28/12/1940 43 days Heavy  
Gorton Works 05/11/1942 12/12/1942 38 days General
Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/12/1944 20/01/1945 36 days General
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1947 26/04/1947 36 days General
Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1921 To Service To service as GCR Number 38
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3480
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
14/10/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
03/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
28/07/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
28/01/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/11/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1923. Dep: 22/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5038
   
13/02/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/02/1926. Dep: 24/04/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13)
   
30/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1927. Dep: 24/09/1927.    
09/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1929. Dep: 30/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13)
   
27/09/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1930. Dep: 08/11/1930.    
06/02/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/02/1932. Dep: 05/03/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13)
   
04/11/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1933. Dep: 09/12/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 345 (Diagram 13)
   
31/08/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1935. Dep: 12/10/1935.
Work undertaken:
New inside cylinders fitted
Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13)
   
30/01/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 27/02/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 424 (Diagram 13)
   
23/07/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1938. Dep: 20/08/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13)
   
06/07/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1940. Dep: 27/07/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13)
   
16/11/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/11/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940.    
05/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 791 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
16/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/12/1944. Dep: 20/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13)
   
25/06/1945 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
31/07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1365    
22/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1947. Dep: 26/04/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61365 but not taken up    
07/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61702    
13/06/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 61702 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev