Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 56 Today
» 960 Yesterday
» 3877 Week
» 21213 Month
» 299009 Year
» 1183390 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 460 m/e 10/1921
LNER (1924) 5460   19/04/1924
LNER (1946) 1368   03/08/1946
BR (BR 1st) 61368   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/110/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3483
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 10/1921
Withdrawal Wed 06/10/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 27 yrs , 6 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 9/10/48 but cut at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden 02/12/1921
WFD Woodford Halse 08/10/1935
ANN Annesley 05/09/1943
GOR Gorton 30/10/1943
   Withdrawn 06/10/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton 06/10/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1926)
26/05/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1925)
24/10/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 65)
12/08/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1923)
26/01/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 534)
26/09/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 295)
05/02/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3010)
24/02/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 86)
02/01/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 51)
01/01/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3027)
03/08/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3043)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 09/02/1924 19/04/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5460
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1925 06/03/1926 78 days General  
Gorton Works 14/04/1928 26/05/1928 43 days General
Boiler number 1925 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/12/1929 01/02/1930 43 days General  
Gorton Works 19/09/1931 24/10/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/07/1933 12/08/1933 22 days General
Boiler number 1923 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/01/1935 26/01/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1936 26/09/1936 36 days General
Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/01/1938 05/02/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/09/1938 17/09/1938 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 27/01/1940 24/02/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/04/1940 18/05/1940 36 days Light Repair
After collision
 
Gorton Works 04/12/1942 02/01/1943 30 days General
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/12/1943 01/01/1944 30 days General
Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1946 03/08/1946 36 days General
Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1368
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1921 To Service To service as GCR Number 460
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3483
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
02/12/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
09/02/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 19/04/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5460
   
19/12/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1925. Dep: 06/03/1926.    
14/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1925 (Diagram 13)
   
21/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 01/02/1930.    
19/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13)
   
22/07/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 12/08/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1923 (Diagram 13)
   
05/01/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
   
08/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
22/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 26/09/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13)
   
15/01/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 05/02/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13)
   
03/09/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938.    
27/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13)
   
13/04/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940.
Work undertaken:
After collision
   
04/12/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
   
05/09/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/12/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1943. Dep: 01/01/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 13)
   
29/06/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1368
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61368 but not taken up    
06/10/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1368 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev