|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 09/02/1924 | 19/04/1924 | 71 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5460 |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1925 | 06/03/1926 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1928 | 26/05/1928 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1925 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/12/1929 | 01/02/1930 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/09/1931 | 24/10/1931 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1933 | 12/08/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 1923 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1935 | 26/01/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1936 | 26/09/1936 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/01/1938 | 05/02/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/09/1938 | 17/09/1938 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 27/01/1940 | 24/02/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/04/1940 | 18/05/1940 | 36 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1942 | 02/01/1943 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 03/12/1943 | 01/01/1944 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/06/1946 | 03/08/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1368 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 460 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3483 Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
02/12/1921 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
09/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/02/1924. Dep: 19/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5460 |
||
19/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1925. Dep: 06/03/1926. | ||
14/04/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1925 (Diagram 13) |
||
21/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/12/1929. Dep: 01/02/1930. | ||
19/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1931. Dep: 24/10/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 12/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1923 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1935. Dep: 26/01/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13) |
||
08/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
22/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1936. Dep: 26/09/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 295 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/01/1938. Dep: 05/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13) |
||
03/09/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1938. Dep: 17/09/1938. | ||
27/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1940. Dep: 24/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13) |
||
13/04/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/04/1940. Dep: 18/05/1940. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
04/12/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1942. Dep: 02/01/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/09/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
03/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1943. Dep: 01/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/06/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1946. Dep: 03/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3043 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1368 |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61368 but not taken up | ||
06/10/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1368 from Gorton (GOR) |