Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 917 Today
» 1099 Yesterday
» 3056 Week
» 13226 Month
» 291022 Year
» 1175403 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 461 m/e 11/1921
LNER (1924) 5461   05/07/1924
LNER (1946) 1369   22/11/1946
BR (BR 1st) 61369   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/111/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3484
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1921
Withdrawal Sat 21/08/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 26 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden 09/12/1921
DON Doncaster 02/05/1934
NEA Neasden 12/09/1934
WFD Woodford Halse 10/10/1935
GOR Gorton 10/10/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall 20/10/1946
GOR Gorton 16/04/1947
   Withdrawn 21/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 26/10/1946
ALLOC GOR Gorton 16/04/1947
WDN GOR Gorton 21/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1927)
10/07/1926 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1845)
08/08/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1698)
02/09/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 65)
25/05/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 51)
05/12/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)
25/06/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3015)
25/11/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 263)
04/07/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3005)
06/05/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3014)
23/02/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 51)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 19/04/1924 05/07/1924 78 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5461
 
Gorton Works 03/04/1926 10/07/1926 99 days General
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1928 19/05/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 14/12/1929 08/02/1930 57 days General  
Gorton Works 11/07/1931 08/08/1931 29 days General
Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/08/1933 02/09/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1935 25/05/1935 36 days General
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1936 05/12/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/05/1938 25/06/1938 29 days General
Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1939 25/11/1939 22 days General
Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/06/1942 04/07/1942 26 days General
Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/03/1944 06/05/1944 44 days General
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/01/1946 23/02/1946 39 days General
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 24/08/1946 21/09/1946 29 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1921 To Service To service as GCR Number 461
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3484
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
09/12/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
19/04/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5461
   
03/04/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/04/1926. Dep: 10/07/1926.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
   
24/03/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1928. Dep: 19/05/1928.    
14/12/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1929. Dep: 08/02/1930.    
11/07/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1931. Dep: 08/08/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1698 (Diagram 13)
   
05/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1933. Dep: 02/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13)
   
02/05/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (DON)    
12/09/1934 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
20/04/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1935. Dep: 25/05/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
   
10/10/1935 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
14/11/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1936. Dep: 05/12/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
   
28/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/05/1938. Dep: 25/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13)
   
04/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1939. Dep: 25/11/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
   
09/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1942. Dep: 04/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3005 (Diagram 13)
   
10/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
24/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1944. Dep: 06/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
   
16/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1946. Dep: 23/02/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13)
   
24/08/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1946. Dep: 21/09/1946.    
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
22/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1369    
16/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61369 but not taken up    
21/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1369 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev