Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 653 Today
» 988 Yesterday
» 4784 Week
» 14954 Month
» 292750 Year
» 1177131 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 463 m/e 11/1921
LNER (1924) 5463   15/03/1924
LNER (1946) 1371   26/11/1946
BR (BR 1st) 61371   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/111/1921
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3486
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1921
Withdrawal Sat 22/01/1949 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 27 yrs, 2 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
NEA Neasden 09/12/1921
WFD Woodford Halse 12/01/1923
ANN Annesley 19/07/1924
NEA Neasden 15/11/1924
WFD Woodford Halse 17/11/1924
GOR Gorton 30/10/1943
   Withdrawn 22/01/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton 22/01/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1929)
28/01/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 65)
04/07/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1847)
16/09/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 539)
08/06/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3004)
16/01/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3015)
04/06/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 300)
27/01/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3001)
25/07/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 8)
24/06/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 773)
17/08/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3024)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 22/12/1923 15/03/1924 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5463
 
Gorton Works 14/11/1925 20/02/1926 99 days General  
Gorton Works 26/11/1927 28/01/1928 64 days General
Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/06/1929 27/07/1929 29 days General  
Gorton Works 30/05/1931 04/07/1931 36 days General
Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/08/1933 16/09/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/05/1935 08/06/1935 22 days General
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/12/1936 16/01/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 14/05/1938 04/06/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 300 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/01/1940 27/01/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/06/1942 25/07/1942 40 days General
Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/05/1944 24/06/1944 26 days General
Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/07/1946 17/08/1946 22 days General
Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1921 To Service To service as GCR Number 463
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3486
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
09/12/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
12/01/1923 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
22/12/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/12/1923. Dep: 15/03/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5463
   
19/07/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
15/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
17/11/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
14/11/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/11/1925. Dep: 20/02/1926.    
26/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1927. Dep: 28/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 65 (Diagram 13)
   
29/06/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929.    
30/05/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1931. Dep: 04/07/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1847 (Diagram 13)
   
12/08/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1933. Dep: 16/09/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13)
   
18/05/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1935. Dep: 08/06/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
   
19/12/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1936. Dep: 16/01/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3015 (Diagram 13)
   
14/05/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1938. Dep: 04/06/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 300 (Diagram 13)
   
06/01/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/01/1940. Dep: 27/01/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13)
   
16/06/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1942. Dep: 25/07/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 8 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
30/05/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/05/1944. Dep: 24/06/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13)
   
27/07/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/07/1946. Dep: 17/08/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 13)
   
26/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1371    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61371 but not taken up    
22/01/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1371 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev