|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 05/04/1924 | 05/07/1924 | 92 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5466 |
||
Gorton Works | 28/08/1926 | 04/12/1926 | 99 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1929 | 02/03/1929 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1930 | 27/09/1930 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/06/1932 | 16/07/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1934 | 26/05/1934 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/03/1936 | 04/04/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1938 | 19/02/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1940 | 06/07/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1941 | 08/11/1941 | 33 days | General | Four new cylinders fitted Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/12/1941 | 17/01/1942 | 29 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 25/11/1943 | 18/12/1943 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/01/1946 | 23/03/1946 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 18/09/1948 | 18/09/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 466 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
24/02/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
05/04/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/04/1924. Dep: 05/07/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5466 |
||
09/09/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
28/08/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1926. Dep: 04/12/1926. | ||
05/01/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/03/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
09/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1930. Dep: 27/09/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 356 (Diagram 13) |
||
18/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/06/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1848 (Diagram 13) |
||
14/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1934. Dep: 26/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1928 (Diagram 13) |
||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 04/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3001 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/01/1938. Dep: 19/02/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1940. Dep: 06/07/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/02/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
07/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1941. Dep: 08/11/1941. Work undertaken: Four new cylinders fitted Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 13) |
||
20/12/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/12/1941. Dep: 17/01/1942. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/11/1943. Dep: 18/12/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3029 (Diagram 13) |
||
26/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/01/1946. Dep: 23/03/1946. | ||
15/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1374 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61374 but not taken up | ||
18/09/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1374 from Gorton (GOR) | ||
18/09/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 18/09/1948. Dep: 18/09/1948. |