|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 23/02/1924 | 26/04/1924 | 64 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5473 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/06/1926 | 04/09/1926 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/09/1928 | 05/01/1929 | 106 days | General | Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/02/1929 | 02/03/1929 | 8 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 16/08/1930 | 04/10/1930 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1932 | 19/11/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/11/1934 | 01/12/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 21/11/1936 | 11/12/1936 | 21 days | General | Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1938 | 10/12/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/08/1940 | 21/09/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 11/05/1943 | 29/05/1943 | 19 days | General | Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 31/03/1945 | 12/05/1945 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1946 | 06/04/1946 | 15 days | Light Repair | New left hand outside cylinder fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 09/08/1947 | 06/09/1947 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3050 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1922 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 473 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
29/07/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
23/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/02/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5473 |
||
22/09/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
28/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/06/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/06/1926. Dep: 04/09/1926. | ||
27/01/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
22/09/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/09/1928. Dep: 05/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13) |
||
23/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/02/1929. Dep: 02/03/1929. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
16/08/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/08/1930. Dep: 04/10/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 73 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/10/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1932. Dep: 19/11/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13) |
||
10/11/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/11/1934. Dep: 01/12/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 397 (Diagram 13) |
||
21/11/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1936. Dep: 11/12/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13) |
||
12/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1938. Dep: 10/12/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/03/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
24/08/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1940. Dep: 21/09/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/07/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
01/11/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
11/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1943. Dep: 29/05/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 784 (Diagram 13) |
||
29/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
31/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 12/05/1945. | ||
23/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/03/1946. Dep: 06/04/1946. Work undertaken: New left hand outside cylinder fitted |
||
12/01/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1381 | ||
09/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/08/1947. Dep: 06/09/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3050 (Diagram 13) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61381 but not taken up | ||
30/04/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61706 | ||
26/12/1949 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61706 from Gorton (GOR) |