Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 572 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3715 Week
» 13885 Month
» 291681 Year
» 1176062 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 474 m/e 08/1922
LNER (1924) 5474   26/07/1924
LNER (1946) 1382   01/12/1946
BR (BR 1st) 61382   Not applied
BR (BR 2nd) 61707   30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B7/108/1922
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 08/1922
Withdrawal Mon 13/06/1949 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 26 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 26/08/1922
NEA Neasden 16/06/1927
WFD Woodford Halse 27/09/1941
GOR Gorton 30/10/1943
   Withdrawn 13/06/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton 13/06/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 300)
30/03/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 59)
06/05/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 526)
11/07/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3012)
02/07/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 534)
12/10/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3023)
24/04/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1932)
06/01/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 81)
22/03/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3009)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 17/05/1924 26/07/1924 71 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5474
 
Gorton Works 25/07/1925 17/10/1925 85 days General  
Gorton Works 12/02/1927 16/04/1927 64 days General  
Gorton Works 16/02/1929 30/03/1929 43 days General
Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1931 14/03/1931 43 days General  
Gorton Works 08/04/1933 06/05/1933 29 days General
Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/07/1934 25/08/1934 36 days General  
Gorton Works 13/06/1936 11/07/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/06/1938 02/07/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/09/1940 12/10/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1943 24/04/1943 23 days General
Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1944 06/01/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1947 22/03/1947 29 days General
Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1922 To Service To service as GCR Number 474
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
26/08/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/05/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/05/1924. Dep: 26/07/1924.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5474
   
25/07/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/07/1925. Dep: 17/10/1925.    
12/02/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 16/04/1927.    
16/06/1927 Allocation Reallocated to Neasden (NEA)    
16/02/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 30/03/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 59 (Diagram 13)
   
31/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 14/03/1931.    
08/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
   
21/07/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/07/1934. Dep: 25/08/1934.    
13/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 11/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3012 (Diagram 13)
   
11/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1938. Dep: 02/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 534 (Diagram 13)
   
21/09/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/09/1940. Dep: 12/10/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 13)
   
27/09/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
02/04/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1943. Dep: 24/04/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1944. Dep: 06/01/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
   
01/12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1382    
22/02/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1947. Dep: 22/03/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61382 but not taken up    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61707    
13/06/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 61707 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev