|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 19/09/1925 | 12/12/1925 | 85 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5475 |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1927 | 05/11/1927 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 05/10/1929 | 30/11/1929 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 406 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1932 | 13/02/1932 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 273 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 09/12/1933 | 06/01/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/08/1935 | 31/08/1935 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/05/1937 | 22/05/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/01/1938 | 05/02/1938 | 15 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 11/02/1939 | 18/03/1939 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 09/06/1941 | 12/07/1941 | 34 days | General | Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/05/1943 | 19/06/1943 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1944 | 05/08/1944 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 25/08/1945 | 22/09/1945 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/10/1947 | 22/11/1947 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/08/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
11/08/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 475 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Neasden (NEA) Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
19/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/09/1925. Dep: 12/12/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5475 |
||
10/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
17/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1927. Dep: 05/11/1927. | ||
05/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 406 (Diagram 13) |
||
23/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1932. Dep: 13/02/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 273 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 06/01/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/03/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
08/09/1934 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
10/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1935. Dep: 31/08/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) | ||
05/11/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
01/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1937. Dep: 22/05/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/01/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/01/1938. Dep: 05/02/1938. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
11/02/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/02/1939. Dep: 18/03/1939. | ||
30/08/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
09/06/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/06/1941. Dep: 12/07/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/05/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/05/1943. Dep: 19/06/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13) |
||
24/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
22/07/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 22/07/1944. Dep: 05/08/1944. | ||
25/08/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1945. Dep: 22/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3020 (Diagram 13) |
||
19/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1388 | ||
18/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1947. Dep: 22/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13) |
||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61388 but not taken up | ||
14/05/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61710 | ||
12/06/1949 | Allocation | Loaned to To London Midland Region (91M) | ||
24/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
20/02/1950 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61710 from Gorton (39A) | ||
04/1950 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton |