Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 732 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3875 Week
» 14045 Month
» 291841 Year
» 1176222 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1923 Int) 478C   20/10/1923
LNER (1924) 5478   25/07/1925
LNER (1946) 1391   25/11/1946
BR (Tmp) E1391   28/02/1948
BR (BR 1st) 61391   29/01/1949
BR (BR 2nd) 61711   30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 20/10/1923 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 03/07/1950 off Gorton (39A)
Scrapping During 09/1950 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 26 yrs, 8 mths , 13 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 8/7/50

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) 20/10/1923
IMM Immingham 19/07/1929
WFD Woodford Halse 03/05/1943
ANN Annesley 24/05/1943
WFD Woodford Halse 21/06/1943
ANN Annesley 05/07/1943
GOR Gorton 30/10/1943
   Withdrawn 03/07/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 03/07/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
20/10/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 66)
20/04/1929 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 69)
06/05/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 576)
01/02/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3009)
30/10/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 773)
19/08/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3024)
18/10/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3027)
04/12/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3004)
04/08/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3010)
28/02/1948 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3028)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 02/05/1925 25/07/1925 85 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5478
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1927 20/08/1927 52 days General  
Gorton Works 16/03/1929 20/04/1929 36 days General
Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/01/1931 07/03/1931 36 days General  
Gorton Works 26/09/1931 10/10/1931 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 01/04/1933 06/05/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/01/1936 01/02/1936 29 days General
Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/10/1937 30/10/1937 22 days General
Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/07/1939 19/08/1939 36 days General
Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/08/1941 18/10/1941 58 days General
Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 27/10/1943 04/12/1943 39 days General
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/08/1944 26/08/1944 1 day Light Repair  
Gorton Works 09/12/1944 09/12/1944 1 day Light Repair
Tender in collision
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1945 04/08/1945 43 days General
After collision
Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/02/1948 28/02/1948 22 days General
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1391
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
20/10/1923 To Service To service as LNER Number 478
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
02/05/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/05/1925. Dep: 25/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5478
   
30/06/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1927. Dep: 20/08/1927.    
16/03/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/03/1929. Dep: 20/04/1929.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 69 (Diagram 13)
   
19/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
31/01/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1931. Dep: 07/03/1931.    
26/09/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931.    
01/04/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/04/1933. Dep: 06/05/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 576 (Diagram 13)
   
04/01/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/01/1936. Dep: 01/02/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13)
   
09/10/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1937. Dep: 30/10/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13)
   
15/07/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/07/1939. Dep: 19/08/1939.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 13)
   
22/08/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1941. Dep: 18/10/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3027 (Diagram 13)
   
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
24/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
21/06/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
05/07/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
27/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/10/1943. Dep: 04/12/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
   
30/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/08/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/08/1944. Dep: 26/08/1944.    
09/12/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/12/1944. Dep: 09/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Tender in collision
   
23/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945.
Work undertaken:
After collision
Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13)
   
25/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1391    
07/02/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/02/1948. Dep: 28/02/1948.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to BR (Tmp) number E1391
   
29/01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61391    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61711    
03/07/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 61711 from Gorton (39A)    
09/1950 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    

prev prev