Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 139 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3282 Week
» 13452 Month
» 291248 Year
» 1175629 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1923 Int) 480C   24/11/1923
LNER (1924) 5480   25/07/1925
LNER (1946) 1393   08/09/1946
BR (BR 1st) 61393   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Tue 24/11/1923 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Tue 03/08/1948 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 24 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys
Information Built with revised cylinders

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) 24/11/1923
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 30/06/1930
SHF Sheffield Darnall 11/04/1943
ANN Annesley 03/05/1943
GOR Gorton 24/10/1943
   Withdrawn 03/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton 03/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
24/11/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 244)
22/02/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 503)
23/04/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1849)
06/01/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 300)
14/03/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1845)
04/12/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 81)
06/04/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 526)
07/11/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3019)
02/12/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 526)
09/11/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3026)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 25/04/1925 25/07/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5480
 
Gorton Works 23/07/1927 17/09/1927 57 days General  
Gorton Works 13/10/1928 10/11/1928 29 days Light Repair
Re-tubing
 
Gorton Works 11/01/1930 22/02/1930 43 days General
Boiler number 503 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 02/04/1932 23/04/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/12/1933 06/01/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 300 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/02/1936 14/03/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/11/1937 04/12/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 09/03/1940 06/04/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/10/1942 07/11/1942 31 days General
Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/11/1944 02/12/1944 22 days General
Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1946 09/11/1946 43 days General
New inside cylinders fined
Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 03/08/1948 03/08/1948 1 day No repairs  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
24/11/1923 To Service To service as LNER Number 480
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
25/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/04/1925. Dep: 25/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5480
   
23/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1927. Dep: 17/09/1927.    
13/10/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/10/1928. Dep: 10/11/1928.
Work undertaken:
Re-tubing
   
11/01/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 22/02/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 503 (Diagram 13)
   
30/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
02/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/04/1932. Dep: 23/04/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1849 (Diagram 13)
   
09/12/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/12/1933. Dep: 06/01/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 300 (Diagram 13)
   
22/02/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1936. Dep: 14/03/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13)
   
06/11/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1937. Dep: 04/12/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 81 (Diagram 13)
   
09/03/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/03/1940. Dep: 06/04/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
   
08/10/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/10/1942. Dep: 07/11/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13)
   
11/04/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
24/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
11/11/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1944. Dep: 02/12/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13)
   
08/09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1393    
28/09/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1946. Dep: 09/11/1946.
Work undertaken:
New inside cylinders fined
Boiler number 3026 (Diagram 13)
   
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61393 but not taken up    
03/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1393 from Gorton (GOR)    
03/08/1948 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 03/08/1948. Dep: 03/08/1948.    

prev prev