|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 12/09/1925 | 05/12/1925 | 85 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 20/08/1927 | 15/10/1927 | 57 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 15/06/1929 | 27/07/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/09/1931 | 07/11/1931 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/12/1931 | 13/02/1932 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 11/03/1933 | 08/04/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 15/09/1934 | 06/10/1934 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1936 | 04/07/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 06/11/1937 | 27/11/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/10/1938 | 26/11/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/11/1940 | 21/12/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 12/11/1942 | 12/12/1942 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 3041 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/01/1944 | 19/02/1944 | 38 days | General | New right hand outside cylinder fitted after collision Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 12/01/1946 | 16/02/1946 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3025 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/12/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 5481 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
12/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/09/1925. Dep: 05/12/1925. | ||
20/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927. | ||
28/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
14/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
15/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 27/07/1929. | ||
17/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) | ||
15/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
26/09/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/09/1931. Dep: 07/11/1931. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1845 (Diagram 13) |
||
26/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/12/1931. Dep: 13/02/1932. | ||
11/03/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1933. Dep: 08/04/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 355 (Diagram 13) |
||
13/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13) |
||
06/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/11/1937. Dep: 27/11/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3009 (Diagram 13) |
||
07/03/1938 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF) | ||
29/10/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/10/1938. Dep: 26/11/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 51 (Diagram 13) |
||
23/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 21/12/1940. | ||
12/11/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1942. Dep: 12/12/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3041 (Diagram 13) |
||
11/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
03/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
13/01/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1944. Dep: 19/02/1944. Work undertaken: New right hand outside cylinder fitted after collision Boiler number 3030 (Diagram 13) |
||
12/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/01/1946. Dep: 16/02/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3025 (Diagram 13) |
||
21/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1394 | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61394 but not taken up | ||
22/04/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1394 from Gorton (GOR) |