|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 17/10/1925 | 19/12/1925 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 26/11/1927 | 28/01/1928 | 64 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 11/01/1930 | 15/02/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 273 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 19/12/1931 | 23/01/1932 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 292 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 22/07/1933 | 12/08/1933 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/01/1935 | 02/02/1935 | 29 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 27/06/1936 | 25/07/1936 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/12/1937 | 22/01/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 02/12/1939 | 23/12/1939 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 18/03/1942 | 11/04/1942 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 28/12/1943 | 22/01/1944 | 26 days | General | Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/03/1946 | 27/04/1946 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/11/1948 | 30/11/1948 | 1 day | No repairs |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
22/12/1923 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 5482 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Allocated to Gorton (GOR) Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
03/05/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) | ||
17/10/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/10/1925. Dep: 19/12/1925. | ||
17/12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
26/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/11/1927. Dep: 28/01/1928. | ||
11/01/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/01/1930. Dep: 15/02/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 273 (Diagram 13) |
||
19/12/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/12/1931. Dep: 23/01/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 292 (Diagram 13) |
||
22/07/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/07/1933. Dep: 12/08/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 559 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/01/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/01/1935. Dep: 02/02/1935. | ||
18/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
27/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1936. Dep: 25/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 526 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/12/1937. Dep: 22/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13) |
||
02/12/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/12/1939. Dep: 23/12/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13) |
||
18/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1942. Dep: 11/04/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3034 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/10/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
28/12/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1943. Dep: 22/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3024 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/03/1946. Dep: 27/04/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13) |
||
02/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1395 | ||
19/01/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Walton on the Hill (WAL) | ||
09/02/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61395 but not taken up | ||
30/11/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1395 from Gorton (GOR) | ||
30/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (No repairs) - Arr: 30/11/1948. Dep: 30/11/1948. | ||
01/1949 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield |