Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 990 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 6137 Week
» 16307 Month
» 294103 Year
» 1178484 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 5483   02/02/1924
LNER (1946) 1396   20/10/1946
BR (BR 1st) 61396   19/02/1949
BR (BR 2nd) 61713   30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Mon 02/02/1924 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Mon 05/09/1949 off Gorton (GOR)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 25 yrs, 7 mths , 3 dys
Information Built with revised cylinders

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) 02/02/1924
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 08/05/1929
MEX Mexborough 11/02/1941
ANN Annesley 03/05/1943
GOR Gorton 24/10/1943
   Withdrawn 05/09/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN GOR Gorton 05/09/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/02/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 355)
20/12/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 274)
04/02/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 73)
19/01/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 424)
30/01/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 8)
30/05/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3035)
17/06/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3031)
22/02/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3006)


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/02/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 5483
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
08/05/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
20/12/1930 Modification Diagram 13 number 274 boiler fitted    
04/02/1933 Modification Diagram 13 number 73 boiler fitted    
19/01/1935 Modification Diagram 13 number 424 boiler fitted    
30/01/1937 Modification Diagram 13 number 8 boiler fitted    
11/02/1941 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
30/05/1942 Modification Diagram 13 number 3035 boiler fitted    
03/05/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
24/10/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
17/06/1944 Modification Diagram 13 number 3031 boiler fitted    
20/10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1396    
22/02/1947 Modification Diagram 13 number 3006 boiler fitted    
19/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61396    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 61713    
05/09/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 61713 from Gorton (GOR)    

prev prev