Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 168 Today
» 1008 Yesterday
» 6323 Week
» 16493 Month
» 294289 Year
» 1178670 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LNER (1924) 5484   01/03/1924
LNER (1946) 1397   10/11/1946
BR (BR 1st) 61397   Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B7
Company History GCR/LNER
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service Fri 01/03/1924 to Gorton (GOR)
Withdrawal Fri 04/06/1948 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 3 dys
Information Built with revised cylinders

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 5/6/48 but cut at Dukinfield

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton (New) 01/03/1924
IMM Immingham 30/05/1924
GOR Gorton 05/06/1926
SHF Sheffield Neepsend 15/07/1929
GOR Gorton 30/06/1930
WFD Woodford Halse 21/01/1937
GOR Gorton 27/11/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall 20/10/1946
   Withdrawn 04/06/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall w/e 26/10/1946
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall 04/06/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/03/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 356)
23/08/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 499)
03/09/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 244)
18/07/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1932)
09/04/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 244)
02/12/1939 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3028)
28/06/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3004)
27/11/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 763)
02/03/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3016)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 06/03/1926 05/06/1926 92 days General  
Gorton Works 26/11/1927 03/12/1927 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 18/08/1928 13/10/1928 57 days General  
Gorton Works 19/07/1930 23/08/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 499 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 06/08/1932 03/09/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/08/1934 15/09/1934 43 days General  
Gorton Works 27/06/1936 18/07/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/03/1938 09/04/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 04/11/1939 02/12/1939 29 days General
New inside cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/05/1941 28/06/1941 29 days General
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 21/10/1943 27/11/1943 38 days General
Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 18/01/1946 02/03/1946 44 days General
Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/03/1924 To Service To service as LNER Number 5484
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Allocated to Gorton (GOR)
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
30/05/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
06/03/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1926. Dep: 05/06/1926.    
05/06/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
26/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/11/1927. Dep: 03/12/1927.    
18/08/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/08/1928. Dep: 13/10/1928.    
15/07/1929 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Neepsend (SHF)    
30/06/1930 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
19/07/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/07/1930. Dep: 23/08/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 499 (Diagram 13)
   
06/08/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 06/08/1932. Dep: 03/09/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13)
   
04/08/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1934. Dep: 15/09/1934.    
27/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/06/1936. Dep: 18/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1932 (Diagram 13)
   
21/01/1937 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
19/03/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1938. Dep: 09/04/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 244 (Diagram 13)
   
04/11/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/11/1939. Dep: 02/12/1939.
Work undertaken:
New inside cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3028 (Diagram 13)
   
31/05/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1941. Dep: 28/06/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13)
   
21/10/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1943. Dep: 27/11/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 763 (Diagram 13)
   
27/11/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
18/01/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/01/1946. Dep: 02/03/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13)
   
20/10/1946 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
10/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1397    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61397 but not taken up    
04/06/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 1397 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev