Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 749 Today
» 1040 Yesterday
» 1789 Week
» 11959 Month
» 289755 Year
» 1174136 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 4 m/e 06/1913
LNER (1924) 5004   18/07/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1331   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1349   18/08/1946

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1913 GLENALMOND

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B806/1913
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 06/1913
Withdrawal Fri 28/11/1947 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 03/02/1922
MAR March 01/08/1925
GOR Gorton 29/05/1926
CLK Colwick 09/06/1926
ANN Annesley 08/11/1926
CLK Colwick 16/01/1928
ANN Annesley 15/08/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
   Withdrawn 28/11/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall 28/11/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1913 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1550)
22/12/1917 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1545)
02/09/1922 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)
03/05/1930 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 354)
16/07/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 77)
13/10/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 263)
23/11/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 6)
25/09/1937 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 571)
07/09/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3014)
14/03/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 773)
02/05/1944 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3033)
08/06/1946 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3014)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/11/1917 22/12/1917 50 days General
Boiler number 1545 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/08/1922 02/09/1922 15 days General
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 1923 03/02/1923   Special
Tender only
 
Gorton Works 18/04/1925 18/07/1925 92 days General
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5004
 
Gorton Works 22/10/1927 24/12/1927 64 days General
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 29/03/1930 03/05/1930 36 days General
Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1932 16/07/1932 22 days General
Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 12/11/1932 03/12/1932 22 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 29/09/1934 13/10/1934 15 days General
Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 26/10/1935 23/11/1935 29 days General
Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/08/1937 25/09/1937 29 days General
Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/09/1939 23/09/1939 1 day Light Repair
Superheater header
 
Gorton Works 17/08/1940 07/09/1940 22 days General
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1942 14/03/1942 27 days General
Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/03/1944 02/05/1944 42 days General
Boiler number 3033 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 20/04/1946 08/06/1946 50 days General
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1913 To Service To service as GCR Number 4, name: GLENALMOND
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
03/11/1917 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/11/1917. Dep: 22/12/1917.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1545 (Diagram 13)
   
03/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/08/1922 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/08/1922. Dep: 02/09/1922.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
   
1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Special) - Arr: ?/1923. Dep: 03/02/1923.
Work undertaken:
Tender only
   
18/04/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/04/1925. Dep: 18/07/1925.
Work undertaken:
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5004
   
01/08/1925 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
29/05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
09/06/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
08/11/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
22/10/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1927. Dep: 24/12/1927.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
   
16/01/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
29/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/03/1930. Dep: 03/05/1930.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
   
25/06/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1932. Dep: 16/07/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 77 (Diagram 13)
   
12/11/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/11/1932. Dep: 03/12/1932.    
29/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1934. Dep: 13/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 263 (Diagram 13)
   
26/10/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/10/1935. Dep: 23/11/1935.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 6 (Diagram 13)
   
28/08/1937 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/08/1937. Dep: 25/09/1937.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 571 (Diagram 13)
   
23/09/1939 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/09/1939. Dep: 23/09/1939.
Work undertaken:
Superheater header
   
17/08/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1940. Dep: 07/09/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
   
16/02/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1942. Dep: 14/03/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13)
   
15/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
22/03/1944 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1944. Dep: 02/05/1944.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3033 (Diagram 13)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1331 but not taken up    
20/04/1946 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/04/1946. Dep: 08/06/1946.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3014 (Diagram 13)
   
18/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1349    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
28/11/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1349 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev