|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 11/11/1922 | 30/12/1922 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 1550 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/06/1925 | 31/10/1925 | 134 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5439 |
||
Gorton Works | 16/06/1928 | 06/10/1928 | 113 days | General | Boiler number 305 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1930 | 26/04/1930 | 50 days | General | New cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 09/01/1932 | 13/02/1932 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 14/04/1934 | 28/04/1934 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 08/02/1936 | 22/02/1936 | 15 days | General | Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/08/1936 | 26/09/1936 | 57 days | General | Main frame cracked |
||
Gorton Works | 20/11/1937 | 11/12/1937 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/01/1940 | 10/02/1940 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/03/1943 | 27/03/1943 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 3008 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1945 | 04/08/1945 | 43 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 439, name: SUTTON NELTHORPE Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
29/09/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/11/1922. Dep: 30/12/1922. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1550 (Diagram 13) |
||
03/03/1923 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 439C | ||
20/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/06/1925. Dep: 31/10/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5439 |
||
29/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
16/06/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/06/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 305 (Diagram 13) |
||
08/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1930. Dep: 26/04/1930. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted |
||
09/01/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/01/1932. Dep: 13/02/1932. | ||
14/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 14/04/1934. Dep: 28/04/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 86 (Diagram 13) |
||
08/02/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/02/1936. Dep: 22/02/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 388 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1936. Dep: 26/09/1936. Work undertaken: Main frame cracked |
||
20/11/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/11/1937. Dep: 11/12/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13) |
||
20/01/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/01/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3018 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1943. Dep: 27/03/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3008 (Diagram 13) |
||
10/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
23/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 04/08/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1332 but not taken up | ||
08/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1350 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
14/08/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1350 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |