|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 25/03/1922 | 03/06/1922 | 71 days | General | New cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 28/03/1925 | 04/07/1925 | 99 days | General | Boiler number 299 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5440 |
||
Gorton Works | 11/12/1926 | 26/02/1927 | 78 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/06/1929 | 20/07/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 22/08/1931 | 17/10/1931 | 57 days | General | New cylinders fitted Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 07/10/1933 | 04/11/1933 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/08/1935 | 21/09/1935 | 36 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 08/05/1937 | 05/06/1937 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 26/02/1938 | 26/03/1938 | 29 days | Light Repair | Cracked frame |
||
Gorton Works | 02/09/1939 | 30/09/1939 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/02/1940 | 30/03/1940 | 36 days | Light Repair | After collision |
||
Gorton Works | 16/10/1941 | 15/11/1941 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/11/1943 | 27/11/1943 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 30/06/1945 | 01/09/1945 | 64 days | General | Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 440 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
17/02/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
25/03/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/03/1922. Dep: 03/06/1922. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted |
||
19/07/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI) | ||
14/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
28/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 299 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5440 |
||
25/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
21/05/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
11/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/12/1926. Dep: 26/02/1927. | ||
12/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
08/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/06/1929. Dep: 20/07/1929. | ||
22/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/08/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/01/1933 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
07/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 04/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13) |
||
17/08/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 17/08/1935. Dep: 21/09/1935. | ||
08/05/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/05/1937. Dep: 05/06/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3016 (Diagram 13) |
||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 26/03/1938. Work undertaken: Cracked frame |
||
02/09/1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1939. Dep: 30/09/1939. Work undertaken: Boiler number 773 (Diagram 13) |
||
24/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 24/02/1940. Dep: 30/03/1940. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
16/10/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/10/1941. Dep: 15/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 554 (Diagram 13) |
||
01/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/11/1943. Dep: 27/11/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 583 (Diagram 13) |
||
30/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1945. Dep: 01/09/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3004 (Diagram 13) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1333 but not taken up | ||
15/09/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1351 | ||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
23/10/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1351 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |