|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neasden | 05/08/1921 | 01/09/1921 | 28 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1923 | 28/07/1923 | 71 days | General | Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1925 | 29/08/1925 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 630 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5441 |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1927 | 14/01/1928 | 71 days | General | New cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 08/03/1930 | 26/04/1930 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 23/07/1932 | 20/08/1932 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 17/09/1932 | 24/09/1932 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Gorton Works | 01/09/1934 | 06/10/1934 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 499 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 13/06/1936 | 04/07/1936 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 05/11/1938 | 24/12/1938 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 01/02/1941 | 22/02/1941 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 29/09/1943 | 23/10/1943 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/06/1945 | 25/08/1945 | 64 days | General |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 441 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
05/08/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Neasden (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1921. Dep: 01/09/1921. | ||
06/10/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
19/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1923. Dep: 28/07/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/08/1923 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 441C | ||
03/11/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
25/06/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
09/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
13/06/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 29/08/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 630 (Diagram 13) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5441 |
||
27/03/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
05/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 14/01/1928. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted |
||
08/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1930. Dep: 26/04/1930. | ||
23/07/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13) |
||
17/09/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932. | ||
01/09/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 499 (Diagram 13) |
||
13/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13) |
||
05/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 24/12/1938. | ||
01/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13) |
||
09/08/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
29/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1943. Dep: 23/10/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13) |
||
23/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945. | ||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1334 but not taken up | ||
17/11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1352 | ||
06/05/1947 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1352 from Annesley (ANN) |