Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 140 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3283 Week
» 13453 Month
» 291249 Year
» 1175630 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 441 m/e 09/1914
LNER (1923 Int) 441C   25/08/1923
LNER (1924) 5441   29/08/1925
LNER (1946 1st) 1334   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1352   17/11/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B809/1914
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1914
Withdrawal Tue 06/05/1947 off Annesley (ANN)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 5 dys

Notes
Notes Into Gorton for cutting up 10/5/47

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 06/10/1922
MAR March 03/11/1923
ANN Annesley 25/06/1924
GOR Gorton 09/06/1925
CLK Colwick 27/03/1926
ANN Annesley 09/08/1943
   Withdrawn 06/05/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN ANN Annesley 06/05/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1914 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 305)
28/07/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 626)
29/08/1925 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 630)
20/08/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1546)
06/10/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 499)
04/07/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 781)
22/02/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 556)
23/10/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 781)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Neasden 05/08/1921 01/09/1921 28 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 19/05/1923 28/07/1923 71 days General
Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1925 29/08/1925 78 days General
Boiler number 630 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5441
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1927 14/01/1928 71 days General
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1930 26/04/1930 50 days General  
Gorton Works 23/07/1932 20/08/1932 29 days General
Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 17/09/1932 24/09/1932 8 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 01/09/1934 06/10/1934 36 days General
Boiler number 499 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 13/06/1936 04/07/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 05/11/1938 24/12/1938 50 days General  
Gorton Works 01/02/1941 22/02/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 29/09/1943 23/10/1943 25 days General
Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 23/06/1945 25/08/1945 64 days General  

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 441
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
05/08/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Neasden (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/08/1921. Dep: 01/09/1921.    
06/10/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
19/05/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1923. Dep: 28/07/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 626 (Diagram 13)
   
25/08/1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 441C    
03/11/1923 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
25/06/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
09/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
13/06/1925 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1925. Dep: 29/08/1925.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 630 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5441
   
27/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/11/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1927. Dep: 14/01/1928.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
   
08/03/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/03/1930. Dep: 26/04/1930.    
23/07/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/07/1932. Dep: 20/08/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1546 (Diagram 13)
   
17/09/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/09/1932. Dep: 24/09/1932.    
01/09/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1934. Dep: 06/10/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 499 (Diagram 13)
   
13/06/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13)
   
05/11/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 24/12/1938.    
01/02/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/02/1941. Dep: 22/02/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13)
   
09/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
29/09/1943 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/09/1943. Dep: 23/10/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 781 (Diagram 13)
   
23/06/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/06/1945. Dep: 25/08/1945.    
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1334 but not taken up    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1352    
06/05/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1352 from Annesley (ANN)    

prev prev