|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gorton Works | 18/12/1920 | 05/02/1921 | 50 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 19/05/1923 | 04/08/1923 | 78 days | General | Boiler number 1549 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 25/10/1924 | 10/01/1925 | 78 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5444 |
||
Gorton Works | 12/02/1927 | 09/04/1927 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 1547 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 24/11/1928 | 19/01/1929 | 57 days | General | Boiler number 599 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 10/01/1931 | 21/02/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Gorton Works | 24/06/1933 | 29/07/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 1925 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 20/07/1935 | 17/08/1935 | 29 days | General | New cylinders fitted Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/12/1937 | 08/01/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/03/1940 | 20/04/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 23/01/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 04/11/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 17 days | Light Repair | New cylinders fitted |
||
Gorton Works | 26/05/1945 | 07/07/1945 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 13) |
||
Gorton Works | 01/03/1947 | 19/04/1947 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 13) |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1914 | To Service | To service as Great Central Railway Number 444 Built at Gorton Works, Works Number Diagram 13 boiler fitted |
||
18/12/1920 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 18/12/1920. Dep: 05/02/1921. | ||
24/02/1922 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
19/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/05/1923. Dep: 04/08/1923. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1549 (Diagram 13) |
||
25/08/1923 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 444C | ||
03/11/1923 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
13/10/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
25/10/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/10/1924. Dep: 10/01/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5444 |
||
08/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
16/06/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) | ||
12/02/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1927. Dep: 09/04/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1547 (Diagram 13) |
||
16/06/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
12/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
02/04/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
24/11/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/11/1928. Dep: 19/01/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 599 (Diagram 13) |
||
10/01/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/01/1931. Dep: 21/02/1931. | ||
24/06/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 24/06/1933. Dep: 29/07/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 1925 (Diagram 13) |
||
20/07/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1935. Dep: 17/08/1935. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13) |
||
04/12/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 04/12/1937. Dep: 08/01/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3003 (Diagram 13) |
||
23/03/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1940. Dep: 20/04/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3022 (Diagram 13) |
||
23/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3011 (Diagram 13) |
||
15/06/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) | ||
04/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. Work undertaken: New cylinders fitted |
||
26/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 26/05/1945. Dep: 07/07/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3023 (Diagram 13) |
||
1946 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 1337 but not taken up | ||
18/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1355 | ||
01/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/03/1947. Dep: 19/04/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 3049 (Diagram 13) |
||
27/04/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF) | ||
1948 | Number Allocated | Allocated number 61355 but not taken up | ||
09/1948 | Scrapped | Broken up by Carriage Works: Dukinfield | ||
02/09/1948 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 1355 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF) |