Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 347 Today
» 862 Yesterday
» 3895 Week
» 4785 Month
» 312766 Year
» 1197147 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 445 m/e 11/1914
LNER (1924) 5445   02/02/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1338   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1356   25/08/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B811/1914
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1914
Withdrawal Thu 14/08/1947 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping Locomotive Works (Gorton)
Service Life 32 yrs, 9 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GOR Gorton 22/07/1921
MAR March 10/10/1924
GOR Gorton 20/05/1926
WFD Woodford Halse 08/06/1928
MAR March 13/07/1928
CLK Colwick 14/11/1928
ANN Annesley 15/08/1943
SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
   Withdrawn 14/08/1947

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 27/04/1947
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall 14/08/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1914 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 599)
22/10/1921 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 665)
22/12/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 305)
26/05/1928 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1549)
28/05/1932 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 610)
28/07/1934 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 242)
01/08/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 556)
18/01/1941 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3007)
24/10/1942 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3010)
12/05/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3032)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Gorton Works 03/09/1921 22/10/1921 50 days General
Boiler number 665 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/08/1923 22/12/1923 120 days General
Boiler number 305 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 22/05/1926 14/08/1926 85 days General  
Gorton Works 07/04/1928 26/05/1928 50 days General
Boiler number 1549 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 19/04/1930 24/05/1930 36 days General  
Gorton Works 23/04/1932 28/05/1932 36 days General
Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 30/06/1934 28/07/1934 29 days General
Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/07/1936 01/08/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 01/10/1938 05/11/1938 36 days General
New cylinders fitted
 
Gorton Works 28/12/1940 18/01/1941 22 days General
Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 28/09/1942 24/10/1942 27 days General
Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 31/03/1945 12/05/1945 43 days General
Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 445
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
22/07/1921 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
03/09/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 03/09/1921. Dep: 22/10/1921.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 665 (Diagram 13)
   
25/08/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/08/1923. Dep: 22/12/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 305 (Diagram 13)
   
02/02/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5445    
10/10/1924 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
20/05/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
22/05/1926 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1926. Dep: 14/08/1926.    
07/04/1928 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1928. Dep: 26/05/1928.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1549 (Diagram 13)
   
08/06/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
13/07/1928 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
14/11/1928 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
19/04/1930 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1930. Dep: 24/05/1930.    
23/04/1932 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 23/04/1932. Dep: 28/05/1932.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 610 (Diagram 13)
   
30/06/1934 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 30/06/1934. Dep: 28/07/1934.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 242 (Diagram 13)
   
11/07/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/07/1936. Dep: 01/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 556 (Diagram 13)
   
01/10/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 01/10/1938. Dep: 05/11/1938.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
   
28/12/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/12/1940. Dep: 18/01/1941.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13)
   
28/09/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 28/09/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3010 (Diagram 13)
   
15/08/1943 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
31/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 31/03/1945. Dep: 12/05/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3032 (Diagram 13)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1338 but not taken up    
25/08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1356    
27/04/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
14/08/1947 Withdrawn Condemned as 1356 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev