Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 463 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 463 Week
» 17799 Month
» 295595 Year
» 1179976 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GCR 446 m/e 11/1914
LNER (1924) 5446   06/12/1924
LNER (1946 1st) 1339   Not applied
LNER (1946 2nd) 1357   17/11/1946
BR 61357   Not applied

Names Carried
Date From Name
11/1914 EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Robinson
Class B8
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
B811/1914
Wheels 4-6-0
Builder Gorton Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Brakes (when built) Steam brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1914
Withdrawal Sat 23/04/1949 off Sheffield Darnall (SHF)
Scrapping Carriage Works (Dukinfield)
Service Life 34 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
ANN Annesley 03/02/1922
MAR March 03/11/1923
GOR Gorton 06/12/1924
LEI Leicester (G.C.) 02/03/1925
GOR Gorton 08/06/1925
CLK Colwick 29/03/1926
ANN Annesley 06/06/1926
SHF Sheffield Darnall 05/05/1947
   Withdrawn 23/04/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SHF Sheffield Darnall 05/05/1947
WDN SHF Sheffield Darnall 23/04/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1914 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 626)
10/03/1923 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 299)
06/12/1924 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 665)
10/10/1931 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 1744)
11/11/1933 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 631)
16/03/1935 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3002)
29/08/1936 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 45)
16/07/1938 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 354)
08/06/1940 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 539)
23/01/1943 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3007)
07/04/1945 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 3019)
03/05/1947 Diagram 13 boiler fitted (number 928)


Works Visits
Works Entry Departure Durn Level of Work Mileage
Neasden 12/09/1921 15/10/1921 34 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 27/01/1923 10/03/1923 43 days General
Boiler number 299 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/10/1924 06/12/1924 57 days General
Boiler number 665 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5446
 
Gorton Works 09/07/1927 27/08/1927 50 days General  
Gorton Works 20/07/1929 24/08/1929 36 days General  
Gorton Works 29/08/1931 10/10/1931 43 days General
Boiler number 1744 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 07/10/1933 11/11/1933 36 days General
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 16/02/1935 16/03/1935 29 days General
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/08/1936 29/08/1936 22 days General
Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 25/06/1938 16/07/1938 22 days General
Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 11/05/1940 08/06/1940 29 days General
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 08/03/1941 22/03/1941 15 days Light Repair  
Gorton Works 13/11/1942 23/01/1943 72 days General
Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 10/03/1945 07/04/1945 29 days General
Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13)
 
Gorton Works 15/03/1947 03/05/1947 50 days General
Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13)
 

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1914 To Service To service as GCR Number 446, name: EARL ROBERTS OF KANDAHAR
Built at Gorton Works, Works Number
Diagram 13 boiler fitted
   
12/09/1921 Works Visit Works Visit - Neasden (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/09/1921. Dep: 15/10/1921.    
03/02/1922 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
27/01/1923 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 27/01/1923. Dep: 10/03/1923.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 299 (Diagram 13)
   
03/11/1923 Allocation Reallocated to March (MAR)    
11/10/1924 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/10/1924. Dep: 06/12/1924.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 665 (Diagram 13)
Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 5446
   
06/12/1924 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
02/03/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester (G.C.) (LEI)    
08/06/1925 Allocation Reallocated to Gorton (GOR)    
29/03/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
06/06/1926 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
09/07/1927 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1927. Dep: 27/08/1927.    
20/07/1929 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 20/07/1929. Dep: 24/08/1929.    
29/08/1931 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 10/10/1931.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 1744 (Diagram 13)
   
07/10/1933 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 07/10/1933. Dep: 11/11/1933.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 631 (Diagram 13)
   
16/02/1935 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1935. Dep: 16/03/1935.
Work undertaken:
New cylinders fitted
Boiler number 3002 (Diagram 13)
   
08/08/1936 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1936. Dep: 29/08/1936.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 45 (Diagram 13)
   
25/06/1938 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 354 (Diagram 13)
   
11/05/1940 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1940. Dep: 08/06/1940.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 539 (Diagram 13)
   
08/03/1941 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 08/03/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941.    
13/11/1942 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 13/11/1942. Dep: 23/01/1943.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3007 (Diagram 13)
   
10/03/1945 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1945. Dep: 07/04/1945.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 3019 (Diagram 13)
   
1946 Number Allocated Allocated number 1339 but not taken up    
17/11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 1357    
15/03/1947 Works Visit Works Visit - Gorton Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 03/05/1947.
Work undertaken:
Boiler number 928 (Diagram 13)
   
05/05/1947 Allocation Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    
1948 Number Allocated Allocated number 61357 but not taken up    
23/04/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 1357 from Sheffield Darnall (SHF)    

prev prev